Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 3:22-cv-05238
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 08, 2022 3:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Invoke LLC
Represented By
Steven M Wilker
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Parna A Mehrbani
Lane Powell (or)
contact info
Defendant
SB Alger Studio Productions LLC
Represented By
Thomas W Hayton
Cutler Nylander & Hayton, Ps
contact info
Defendant
Sean B Alger
Represented By
Thomas W Hayton
Cutler Nylander & Hayton, Ps
contact info
Defendant
Sloan Bella
E-filing/Service PO BOX 4706
SUNLAND, CA 91041
Defendant
Clyde Lewis
Defendant
Dean Reiner
Represented By
Steven M Wilker
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Parna A Mehrbani
Lane Powell (or)
contact info
Defendant
Kay Stone
Defendant
Kristie Williams
Represented By
Steven M Wilker
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Parna A Mehrbani
Lane Powell (or)
contact info
Defendant
GEN MEDIA PARTNERS LLC
Defendant
James Maiden
Plaintiff
Al-Hareth Al-Bustani
Represented By
Susan L Ford
Res Nova Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jane and John Does 1-10
Terminated: 07/26/2022
Defendant
Alpha Media LLC
Terminated: 06/14/2022
Defendant
Change.org
Terminated: 07/05/2022
Defendant
Harrison Lindley
Terminated: 09/19/2022
Defendant
Steve Outtrim
Terminated: 09/19/2022
Defendant
Alicia Taylor
Terminated: 08/01/2022
Represented By
Timothy J Billick
Tbillick Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Evan Watson
Terminated: 09/19/2022


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
73 73 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/23 9:24 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella, TO RESPONSE to45 MOTION to Dismiss (Bella, Sloan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
72 72 order 2 - Minute Order Tue 11/22 3:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant Sloan Bella's 11/21/2022 filing (see Response (Dkt. #71 )), the court clarifies that it has not dismissed Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani's case against her. The court has only dismissed Mr. Al-Bustani's WPRA claim against her. Mr. Al-Bustani may continue to litigate his remaining claims against Ms. Bella. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
71 71 misc Response (non motion) Mon 11/21 2:18 PM
RESPONSE by Defendant Sloan Bella (Bella, Sloan)
Related: [-]
70 70 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 11/21 8:53 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's45 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Fri 11/18 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Dkt.68 : This entry has been revised as a Notice to the Court, per the direction of chambers. (LH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
69 69 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Fri 11/18 8:09 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's58 59 Motions for Default against Defendants Alger Studio and Mr. Alger. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
Related: [-]
68 68 misc Response (non motion) Thu 11/17 10:09 AM
RESPONSE by Defendant Sloan Bella (Bella, Sloan)
Related: [-]
67 67 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 11/17 9:38 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Clyde Lewis. (AD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
66 66 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/16 7:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; First Amended by Sean B Alger.(Hayton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
65 65 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/16 7:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by Sean B Alger.(Hayton, Thomas)
Related: [-]