NIEBAUER v. SLIPPERY ROCK UNIVERSITY
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa Pupo Lenihan |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01158 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 12:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
SLIPPERY ROCK UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Evaluator
DAVID B. WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DR. CHRISTOPHER NIEBAUER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
84 | 84
order
Order
Mon 11/06 5:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING the83 Stipulation of Dismissal. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Dr. Christopher Niebauer and Defendant Slippery Rock University, by their respective attorneys, hereby stipulate that the above-captioned case shall be voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/06/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
83 | 83
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 11/03 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHRISTOPHER NIEBAUER. (Schneider, Marcus) |