DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. v. LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy Criswell Wiegand |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00603 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2022 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams)
Tue 02/27 12:59 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (drc) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/05 8:47 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only)
Wed 02/08 1:27 PM
ORDER re31 Stipulation to Consolidate Actions. In light of the parties' stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is consolidated with 2:20-cv-01500, the lead case, for all purposes. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:20-cv-01500. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/8/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/08 9:27 AM
STIPULATION to Consolidate Actions by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order
Mon 01/23 1:18 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/7/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 2/14/2023. Confidential Position Letters due by 2/15/2023. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/23/2023. (jmm) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 01/20 3:37 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses , and COUNTERCLAIM against DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Dickson, Cecilia) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 01/06 12:47 PM
ORDER re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re22 First Amended Complaint, by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD's23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.'s22 First Amended Complaint is DENIED as more fully set forth in said order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD shall file its answer to DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.,'s First Amended Complaint, on or before 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/6/2023. (jmm) |
|
27 | 27
11
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 01/06 12:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re22 First Amended Complaint, by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. Defendant LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD's23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.'s22 First Amended Complaint will be DENIED as more fully stated in said opinion. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/6/2023. (jmm) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply Brief
Tue 11/22 4:47 PM
REPLY BRIEF re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/16 4:19 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC.. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 10/26 7:02 PM
BRIEF in Support re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 10/26 7:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re22 Amended Complaint, by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
21
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/12 7:46 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD answer due 10/26/2022, filed by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 09/28 4:31 PM
ORDER re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC's1 Complaint is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiff DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC shall file any amended complaint on or before 10/12/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 9/28/2022. (jmm) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
8
pgs
respm
Reply Brief
Fri 08/12 2:57 PM
REPLY BRIEF re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/03 11:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Dickson, Cecilia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/03 1:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of13 Motion to Dismiss by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant shall file its reply, if any, in support of its13 Motion on or before 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 8/3/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
21
pgs
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/29 12:10 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (Oberdick, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/21 10:29 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 07/21 3:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition. Plaintiff DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC shall file its responsive briefing to Defendant LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD's13 Motion to Dismiss on or before 7/29/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/21/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
20
pgs
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 07/01 1:23 PM
BRIEF in Support re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
13 | 13
4
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 07/01 1:22 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Coyne, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/01 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kent E. Baldauf, Jr on behalf of LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/01 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia R. Dickson on behalf of LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. (Dickson, Cecilia) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 05/10 1:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD waiver sent on 5/2/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Oberdick, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Tue 04/26 4:06 PM
AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/26 4:03 PM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/26/2022. (jmm) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Tue 04/26 4:02 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/26 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD (jv) |
|
5 | 5
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Tue 04/26 9:18 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC (Oberdick, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/25 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kate E. McCarthy on behalf of DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (McCarthy, Kate) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Mon 04/25 4:12 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (Oberdick, David) |
|
2 | 2
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Mon 04/25 4:05 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC (Oberdick, David) |
|
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/25 3:45 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/2/2022. (jv) |
||
misc
QC - AO 121 Notice (Copyright)
Mon 04/25 3:48 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint. Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (jv) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Mon 04/25 4:39 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: No main Document with signature. CORRECTION: Attorney to file a praecipe to issue summons with the main document being a document that indicates "Praecipe to Issue a summons" with signature of attorney and the summons as an attachment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Mon 04/25 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against LIVING TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7066821), filed by DIGITAL DREAM LABS, INC. (jv) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 50 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 8 pgs Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 6 pgs Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 9 pgs Exhibit H |