Turtle Island Foods v. Strain
Original Case: 3:20-cv-00674
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cr-30236 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 13, 2023 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Michael G. Strain, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Agriculture and Forestry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Turtle Island Foods, S.P.C., doing business as Tofurky Company
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 12 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-30236 Reversed and Vacated ] Judge: JES , Judge: EBC , Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 05/04/2023 [22-30236] |
Docket last updated: 04/13/2023 3:31 AM CDT |
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Michael G. Strain 22-30236 (WMJ) |