Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Bohl
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:605 Federal Communications Act of 1983 |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 11:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
John W Bohl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc
Terminated: 12/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard J Bork, Jr
Terminated: 01/21/2015
|
|
Defendant
Thomas R Darabosh
Terminated: 12/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Randall J Hanus
Terminated: 12/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mert L Summers
Terminated: 12/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Tue 11/10 3:51 PM
ORDER denying31 MOTION to Vacate Judgment, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/10/2015. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) |
|
Monday, October 12, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/12 4:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by John W Bohl re31 MOTION to Vacate Judgment .(Maurer, Franz) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 10/02 3:57 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re31 MOTION to Vacate Judgment .(Balistreri, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Brief in Support of Motion to Vacate | ||
34 | 34
misc
Affidavit
Fri 10/02 3:53 PM
Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Peter S. Balistreri in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment .(Balistreri, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Motion to Vacate Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Supplement Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Tue 09/29 2:24 PM
ORDER FOR RESPONSE to31 MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc., signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/29/2015. Defendant is directed to file a response to Plaintiffs motion on or before October 12, 2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
|
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Tue 09/29 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re32 Letter ; All documents should contain an electronic signature. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mec) |
||
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Mon 09/28 4:02 PM
LETTER from Peter S. Balistreri to the Court . (Balistreri, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Vacate
Wed 09/23 2:35 PM
MOTION to Vacate Judgment by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(Balistreri, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Thu 09/10 3:59 PM
JUDGMENT entered by Deputy Clerk; approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/10/2015. (cc: all counsel)(aw) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings Pretrial Conference - Final
Thu 09/10 2:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/10/2015. Plaintiff's counsel failed to make an appearance. The Court orders this case dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 16. The jury trial is removed from the court calendar. (Tape #091015) (aw) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
trial
Pretrial Report
Thu 09/03 2:00 PM
PRETRIAL REPORT by John W Bohl. (Maurer, Franz) |
|
Thursday, January 22, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/22 9:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/22/2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Wednesday, January 21, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Party
Thu 01/22 9:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 1/21/2015, Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/15/2015, Party bearing burden of proof Expert Witness List due by 7/15/2015, Rebuttal Expert Witness List due by 8/15/2015, Motions due by 6/13/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2015 01:30 PM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 9/21/2015 08:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Richard J Bork, Jr dismissed. (aw) |
|
Monday, January 19, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Mon 01/19 4:13 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Balistreri, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 06, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 01/06 10:10 AM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)The Telephone Scheduling Conference previously set for 1/16/2015 is rescheduled to 1/21/2015 09:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cav) |
||
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/29 1:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. (Robbins, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 12/08 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mert L Summers, Thomas R Darabosh, Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Randall J Hanus. John W Bohl served on 12/1/2014, answer due 12/22/2014. (Medeiros, Erin) |
|
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 12/04 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2015 09:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) report due 1/9/2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Wednesday, December 03, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/03 10:06 AM
Defendant John Bohl's ANSWER to1 Complaint and Response to Crossclaims by John W Bohl.(Maurer, Franz) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/03 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Franz J Maurer on behalf of John W Bohl. Attorney(s) appearing: Franz J. Maurer (Maurer, Franz) |
|
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
Summons on Crossclaim Issued as to John W Bohl. (mec) | ||
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers (Medeiros, Erin) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers Corrected (Notice of Appearance) (Medeiros, Erin) | |
17 | 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers Notice of Appearance (Erin F. Medeiros) (Medeiros, Erin) | |
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin F Medeiros on behalf of Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin F. Medeiros (Medeiros, Erin) | |
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers (Robbins, Matthew) | |
14 | 14 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. (Robbins, Matthew) | |
13 | 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. (Robbins, Matthew) | |
12 | 12 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against John Bohl filed by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers.(Robbins, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Lease | ||
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions Inc as to John W Bohl. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
10 | 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Randall J Hanus served on 9/17/2014, answer due 10/8/2014. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Thomas R Darabosh served on 9/17/2014, answer due 10/8/2014. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Mert L Summers served on 9/24/2014, answer due 10/15/2014. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc served on 9/8/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Richard J Bork, Jr served on 9/8/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
TEXT ONLY ORDER approving5 Stipulation, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/06/2014. Defendants Appleton Labor Temple Association, Inc., Thomas R. Darabosh, Mert L. Summers, and Randall J. Hanus, may answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiffs complaint through October 17, 2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) | ||
Friday, October 03, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answers by Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. (Robbins, Matthew) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Robbins on behalf of Appleton Labor Temple Association Inc, Thomas R Darabosh, Randall J Hanus, Mert L Summers. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew R. Robbins (Robbins, Matthew) | |
Tuesday, September 02, 2014 | ||
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (aw) | ||
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aw) | ||
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
2 | 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Balistreri, Peter) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1951834)(Balistreri, Peter) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site (jcl) |