Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. v. Kidd
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Referred: | Frank J Lynch, Jr |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-14355 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 8:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Robert Henry Kidd
|
|
Plaintiff
Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.
665 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 02/10 1:19 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/10/2015. (ls) |
|
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Default Permanent Injunction
Tue 02/10 1:18 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. against Robert Henry Kidd. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/10/2015. (ls) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction
Tue 02/10 1:14 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Final Default Judgment; granting10 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/10/2015. (ls) |
|
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment Permanent Injunction
Tue 12/02 11:57 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment , Plaintiff's MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Vining, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Eric A. Berger, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Marc Esposito, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Walter-Michael Lee, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Robert Henry Kidd. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/15/2014. (lk) | |
Monday, October 13, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Robert Henry Kidd by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Vining, Jaime) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. Robert Henry Kidd served on 9/16/2014, answer due 10/7/2014. (Vining, Jaime) | |
Tuesday, September 02, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rolex Industries, Inc. for Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Vining, Jaime) | |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 CORRECTED FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ail) | |
4 | 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ail) Image restricted due to filing error on 8/29/2014 (ail). | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Henry Kidd. (ail) | |
2 | 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr (ail) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Counterfeiting and Trademark Infringement against ROBERT HENRY KIDD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7032117, filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Vining, Jaime) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) for Robert Henry Kidd |