Christian Dior Couture SA v. Dior Restaurant, LLC
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Holly L Teeter |
Referred: | Angel D Mitchell |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02182 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 3:36 AM CST |
Defendant
Dior Restaurant, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Dior Couture SA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 24 2022
ORDER regarding 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/24/2022. (amh) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/16 10:18 AM
RETURN Mail received re31 FINAL JUDGMENT UPON CONSENT addressed to Dior Restaurant, LLC. Not remailed. (kas) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Certificate of Compliance
Wed 03/29 12:16 PM
DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC re31 Final Judgment. (kmc) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark
Tue 01/10 12:49 PM
AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (ca) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Final Judgment | ||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Judgment - Consent
Mon 01/09 8:24 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT UPON CONSENT. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 1/6/2023. Mailed to pro se party Dior Restaurant, LLC by regular mail. (ca) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Judgment
Fri 01/06 11:04 AM
MOTION for Order for Entry of Final Judgment Upon Consent by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture SA(Scheiderer, Jason) Modified on 1/6/2023 to chage motion type and remove referral information (sz) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Fri 01/06 11:20 AM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 30 MOTION for Order for Entry of Final Judgment Upon Consent. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(yh) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 12/19 3:34 PM
ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF DEFAULT and granting25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/19/2022.Mailed to Dior Restaurant, LLC care of Aspen Ricks, 16660 Bond Street, Overland Park, KS 66221 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7018 0680 0001 8174 0243. (ca) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Show Cause
Tue 11/29 8:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court orders Dior Restaurant, LLC, to show cause in writing by 12/16/2022, why the court should not direct the clerk to enter default against it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/28/2022. Mailed to Dior Restaurant, LLC by regular and certified mail (tracking # 7020 0640 0001 1580 0446). (mam) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 10/24 5:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order relating to Motion to Withdraw by Dior Restaurant, LLC. (Orantes, Erick) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/24 11:45 AM
ORDER regarding25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/24/2022. (amh) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 10/20 2:22 PM
Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Orantes, Erick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Signed Receipt | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 09/27 2:50 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice22 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Dior Restaurant, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/27/2022. (mam) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 09/27 2:34 PM
ORDER finding as moot21 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Dior Restaurant, LLC. An amended motion was filed (ECF 22). Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/27/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) |
||
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 09/23 3:41 PM
Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Orantes, Erick) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 09/23 1:03 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Barnard, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/17 9:53 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall have until November 14, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/17/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) |
||
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/15 6:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Barnard, David) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/08 2:45 PM
ORDER granting17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Plead. Plaintiff has informed the court it does not oppose the motion. Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC shall have until August 15, 2022, to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) |
||
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/05 3:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Respond or Otherwise Plead and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Barnard, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/06 12:31 PM
ORDER granting15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC shall have until August 8, 2022, to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/6/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/05 2:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Barnard, David) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/09 11:19 AM
ORDER granting13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Plead. Counsel has informed the undersigned's chambers that plaintiff does not oppose the motion, and it is therefore granted as unopposed. Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC shall have until July 8, 2022, to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/9/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) |
||
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/08 5:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Respond, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Dior Restaurant, LLC (Barnard, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
order
Reassigning Case
Wed 06/01 1:42 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/1/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 05/23 2:15 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Christian Dior Couture SA upon Dior Restaurant, LLC served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022 (McGinley, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 05/23 2:11 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason R. Scheiderer on behalf of Christian Dior Couture SA. (Scheiderer, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/23 2:05 PM
MOTION for attorney Sara Gates to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5785969.) by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture SA (McGinley, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/23 2:01 PM
MOTION for attorney Robert M. Wasnofski, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5785958.) by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture SA (McGinley, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/23 2:56 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Wasnofski, Jr for Christian Dior Couture SA pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/23/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/23 2:58 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara Gates for Christian Dior Couture SA pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/23/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) |
||
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
order
Reassigning Case
Wed 05/18 1:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings. U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/18/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(msb) |
||
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 05/17 8:21 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/17 9:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dior Restaurant, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) |
||
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark
Mon 05/16 4:58 PM
AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (McGinley, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/16 4:44 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christian Dior Couture SA identifying Christian Dior, S.E. as corporate parent . (McGinley, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/16 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Christian Dior Couture SA. (McGinley, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Mon 05/16 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5781033.), filed by Christian Dior Couture SA.(McGinley, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F |