T-Mobile USA Inc v. Huawei Device USA Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01351 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 10:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO. LTD
|
|
Defendant
Huawei Device USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Huawei Technologies Co Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T-Mobile USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
1. | Jury sides with T-Mobile in long-running federal lawsuit against Huawei (geekwire.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/18/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties)
Tue 01/02 8:56 AM
Pursuant to the parties'570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts , the trial transcripts in this matter have been provisionally sealed in their entirety pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE) |
||
utility
Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties)
Tue 01/02 9:04 AM
Pursuant to the parties'571 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE , all claims which have been or could have been asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. The Court retains jurisdiction to address sealing issues. (VE) |