Gabaldon v. Correct Care Solutions, LLC et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-10822 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jun 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
61 | 61
order
Order
Mon 05/05 9:44 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the latest status report, D. 60, the Court ORDERS as follows. Counsel for the parties to file a further status report by 6/4/2025 about the bankruptcy proceedings re Wellpath LLC, but the status report shall also expressly address the need to extend the stay as to the non-debtor defendants in this case. (LMH) |