Goyard Saint-Honore v. Various John Does et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:07-cv-11381 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2007 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Jun 16, 2016 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
Various John Does
|
|
Defendant
XYZ Companies
|
|
Plaintiff
Goyard Saint-Honore Societe Anonyme
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 10/28/2008
|
|
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 10/28/2008
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |