Howard et al v. Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-00330 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 9:23 PM CDT |
Defendant
Jeff Hubanks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brad Vilches
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Aguilar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Monroe Howard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
misc
Case File Note
Thu 03/17 4:43 PM
CASE FILE NOTE:24 Exhibit maintained as a material record and sent to the National Records Center (Accession 021 22-0047 Box 14). The remainder of the file is maintained as an electronic record. (ade) |
||
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 12/15 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:33 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Opinion and Order." (thd) |
||
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment
Mon 12/14 1:54 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the33 Order entered in this matter on this date, the Court grants defendants'19 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/14/2015. (rhm) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 12/14 1:52 PM
ORDER granting19 motion for summary judgment and dismissing this case consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/14/2015. (rhm) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 11/20 4:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Wilkerson, John) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order
Fri 11/20 1:40 PM
ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for 11/30/2015. If needed, an Amended Scheduling Order with a new trial date will be docketed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/2015. (rhm) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1)
Mon 11/16 8:45 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re28 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Lawrence) |
|
29 | 29
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 11/16 8:41 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re28 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Lawrence) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/16 8:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs.(Walker, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Anthony Kirkpatrick Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Brad Vichles Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Document Brown Expert Report, | ||
Att: 4 Document Isadore Police Report, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Jeff Hubanks Statement, | ||
Att: 6 Document John Ryan Expert Report, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Laurie Barlow Statment, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit Pauline Lewis Statement, | ||
Att: 9 Document Thomas Martin Expert Report | ||
27 | 27
misc
Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1)
Mon 11/16 6:40 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re21 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Lawrence) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 11/16 11:08 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to File Out of Time. Ms. Howard and Ms. Aguilar may file their response to defendants'19 motion for summary judgment on 11/16/2016. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/16/2015. (rhm) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend Time
Fri 11/13 6:25 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by All Plaintiffs (Walker, John) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/28 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit T- by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches re20 (DVD video recording filed conventionally and maintained in the clerk's office file) (jap) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 10/26 11:11 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to File Exhibit Conventionally and permitting Chief Hubanks and Officer Vilches to file Exhibit T, which is a video, conventionally with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/26/2015. (rhm) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 10/23 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by All Defendants (Wilkerson, John) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1)
Fri 10/23 4:12 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re20 Brief in Support, filed by All Defendants. (Wilkerson, John) |
|
20 | 20
brief
Brief in Support
Fri 10/23 4:08 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants.(Wilkerson, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-G, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits H-I, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits J-L, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibits M-Q, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibits V-Y | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 10/23 3:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants (Wilkerson, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 10/13 2:13 PM
ORDER granting17 motion to extend time and extending the deadline by which all motions other than motions in limine must be filed to 10/24/2015. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/13/2015. (rhm) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time
Fri 10/09 4:02 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches (Wilkerson, John) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Fri 10/02 12:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT Expert Witness by Paula Aguilar, Marilyn Monroe Howard. (Walker, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/01 12:09 PM
STATUS REPORT by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches. (Wilkerson, John) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 09/18 9:39 AM
ORDER granting13 motion for extension of time and extending the deadline by which discovery must be completed to September 30, 2015, and the deadline by which all motions other than motions in limine must be filed to October 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/18/2015. (rhm) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time
Fri 09/11 3:51 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches (Wilkerson, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/23 4:19 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Pine Bluff Courtroom #3602 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 9/16/2015; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/9/2015; Status Report due by 10/1/2015. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/23/2014. (tmw) |
|
Thursday, December 18, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 12/18 2:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches. Joint Report of Rule 26(f) (Wilkerson, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/4/2014; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/18/2014; and proposed Jury Trial is set for the week of 11/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Pine Bluff Courtroom #3602 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/07/2014. (plm) | |
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches.(Wilkerson, John) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lennon Wilkerson on behalf of All Defendants (Wilkerson, John) | |
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Monroe Howard, Paula Aguilar. Brad Vilches served on 9/15/2014. (sld) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Monroe Howard, Paula Aguilar. Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of served on 9/15/2014. (sld) | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Monroe Howard, Paula Aguilar. Jeff Hubanks served on 9/15/2014. (sld) | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Jeff Hubanks, Pine Bluff Arkansas, City of, Brad Vilches. (sld) | |
3 | 3 ORDER granting2 motion to appear pro hac vice. The Court grants Mr. Crump's motion and his admission pro hac vice to represent plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/15/2014. (rhm) | |
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Benjamin Lloyd Crump. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, Receipt Number LIT047784. Filed by Paula Aguilar, Marilyn Monroe Howard (jap) | |
Wednesday, September 03, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Marilyn Monroe Howard and Paula Aguilar against all Defendants. (Fee of $ 400 paid. Receipt Number LIT047618.) No summons issued. (rhm) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |