United States of America v. Approximately $11,800.00 in U.S. Currency
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William B Shubb |
Referred: | Dale A Drozd |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02046 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 10:54 PM PDT |
Claimant
Tasha Boutte
|
|
Claimant
Keidric Rouege
|
|
Claimant
Michael Rouege
|
|
Claimant
Rachel Leah Rouege
|
|
Claimant
Sigrid Rouege
|
|
Defendant
Approximately $11,800.00 in U.S. Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 03/04 2:29 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $11,800.00 in U.S. Currency; Tasha Boutte; Keidric Rouege; Michael Rouege; Rachel Leah Rouege; and Sigrid Rouege (Marciel, M) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 03/04 2:18 PM
ORDER ADOPTING18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/3/2015. Tasha Boutte, Keidric Rouege, Sigrid Rouege, Rachel Leah Rouege, and Michael Rouege are HELD in16 DEFAULT. A Final Judgment of Forfeiture is entered against any right, title, or interest of named parties. Final Judgment of Forfeiture is entered against any right, title, or interest in the Defendant Currency to United States, to be DISPOSED of according to law. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Marciel, M) |
|
Monday, January 12, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 01/12 11:10 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, recommending that Tasha Boutte, Keidric Rouege, Sigrid Rouege, Rachel Leah Rouege, and Michael Rouege be held in default; that government's16 Motion for Default and Final Judgment of Forfeiture be granted; that Judgment by Default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Tasha Boutte, Keidric Rouege, Sigrid Rouege, Rachel Leah Rouege, and Michael Rouege in Defendant Currency referenced, signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/9/2015. These F/Rs are SUBMITTED to Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Marciel, M) |
|
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Wed 01/07 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are notified that16 the United States' Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment has been improperly filed without a written notice. Pursuant to Local Rule (302(c)(19), this motion shall be heard before the assigned Magistrate Judge, Dale A. Drozd. The filer is instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Drozd's courtroom clerk for an available hearing date and time. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 01/07/2015) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 01/07 1:47 PM
EX PARTE MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT and FINAL JUDGMENT of FORFEITURE by United States of America. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/12/2015 (Marciel, M) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Findings and Recommendations, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture | ||
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 12/19 6:12 PM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/19/2014 GRANTING14 USA's Request to continue the Scheduling Conference date to 4/13/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 12/19 10:18 AM
REQUEST and PROPOSED ORDER re Continuing Pretrial Scheduling Conference by United States of America. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/22/2014 (Kaminski, H). |
|
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 12/09 9:25 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Tasha Boutte, Keidric Rouege, Michael Rouege, Rachel Leah Rouege, Sigrid Rouege* (Zignago, K.) |
|
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Request
Mon 12/08 3:51 PM
REQUEST for Entry of Default Against Tasha Boutte, Keidric Rouege, Sigrid Rouege, Rachel Leah Rouege, and Michael Rouege by United States of America.(Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request to Clerk for Entry of Default | ||
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date October 6, 2014. (Spivak, Jeffrey) | |
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America for1 Complaint,2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS,3 Order, and4 Order as to Rachel Leah Rouege. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2014 (Marciel, M) | |
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America for1 Complaint,2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS,3 Order, and4 Order as to Michael Rouege. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2014 (Marciel, M). | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America for1 Complaint,2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS,3 Order, and4 Order as to Sigrid Rouege. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2014 (Marciel, M) | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America for1 Complaint,2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS,3 Order, and4 Order as to Keidric Rouege. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2014 (Marciel, M) | |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Spivak, Jeffrey) | |
Thursday, October 23, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 PROOF OF SERVICE of Arrest of Defendant Approximately $11,800.00 in U.S. Currency on 10/21/14. Warrant for Arrest and Affidavit attached by United States of America. (Spivak, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/24/2014 (Kaminski, H). | |
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER regarding Clerk's issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem. signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/5/2014. (Marciel, M) | |
Att: 1 Warrant Issued | ||
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/5/2014. (Donati, J) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H) | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $11,800.00 in U.S. Currency by United States of America. Attorney Spivak, Jeffrey A. added.(Spivak, Jeffrey) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Publication |