ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V. v. Coporacion Venezolana Del Petroleo, S.A. et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Case #: | 1:22-mc-00264 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Registration of Foreign Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 26, 2023 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Coporacion Venezolana Del Petroleo, S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
service
Writ Returned
Mon 04/08 4:14 PM
Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias Returned Executed as to PDV Holding, Inc.. (vfm) |
|
45 | 45
service
Writ Returned
Mon 04/08 4:13 PM
Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias Returned Executed as to Special Master Robert B. Pincus. (vfm) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
9
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/03 10:09 AM
FINAL PRIORITY ORDER re: Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 646 Memorandum Order Relating to Additional Judgments, Priority, and Transaction Expenses; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 738 Memorandum Order re: Steps 5 and 7 Deadlines and Priority Arrangement Procedures; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 990 Order re: Special Master's Motion Requesting Amendment of Certain Priority Arrangement Procedures. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/3/2024. (mpb) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/28 3:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Lydia L. Halpern re (738 in 1:17-mc-00151-LPS) Memorandum and Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (996 in 1:17-mc-00151-LPS) Order, (693 in 1:17-mc-00151-LPS) Status Report, (1036 in 1:17-mc-00151-LPS) Order, Affidavit of Delivery to U.S. Marshal filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Taylor, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
order
Writ Issued
Fri 03/08 3:48 PM
WRIT of Attachment Fieri Facias issued. Available for pick-up at Clerk's Office between 8:30AM-4PM. (nmg) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
9
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/07 3:25 PM
WRIT ORDER re: Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 646 Memorandum Order Relating to Additional Judgments, Priority, and Transaction Expenses; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 738 Memorandum Order re: Steps 5 and 7 Deadlines and Priority Arrangement Procedures; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 990 Order re: Special Master's Motion Requesting Amendment of Certain Priority Arrangement Procedures. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/2024. (apk) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Affidavit
Tue 03/05 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Garrett B. Moritz re (68 in 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 52 in 1:22-mc-00464-LPS, 39 in 1:22-mc-00264-LPS, 996 in 1:17-mc-00151-LPS) Order, Affidavit of Garrett B. Moritz Attesting to Delivery Of Proposed Writ Packages to The Clerk of the Court filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V..(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C | ||
40 | 40
service
Praecipe
Tue 03/05 12:11 PM
PRAECIPE filed by Garrett B. Moritz on behalf of ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V. requesting Clerk to issue Writ of Fieri Facias(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Priority Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Writ | ||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
9
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/01 3:01 PM
PRIORITY ORDER re: Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 646 Memorandum Order Relating to Additional Judgments, Priority, and Transaction Expenses; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 738 Memorandum Order re: Steps 5 and 7 Deadlines and Priority Arrangement Procedures; Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 990 Order re: Special Master's Motion Requesting Amendment of Certain Priority Arrangement Procedures. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/1/2024. (apk) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 02/23 12:40 PM
Remark: The Status Conference scheduled for Tuesday February 27, 2024 will now take place in Courtroom 2B at 10:00 A.M. (apk) |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
order
Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 02/21 10:13 AM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the letter filed on the Special Master (Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 967), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference rescheduled to February 27 (see Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 962) will be held at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6C in J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building in Wilmington, Delaware. In advance of the Status Conference, the Special Master shall confer with the Sale Process Parties and use reasonable efforts also to confer with other interested entities and, by no later than February 26, submit to the Court an agenda for the matters he proposes be addressed at the Status Conference. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 02/21/2024. (vfm) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
order
Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/13 12:51 PM
ORAL ORDER: Due to weather-related travel challenges, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference and the argument on the motion for miscellaneous relief in connection with the Sale Procedures Order (Misc. Nos. 17-151 D.I. 893 ; 23-340 D.I. 53; 23-378 D.I. 51; 23-379 D.I. 49) scheduled for February 14 are CANCELED and will be RESCHEDULED to February 27, 2024, at a time and in a courtroom in Wilmington, Delaware to be determined. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that argument on Devengoecheas renewed motion for a writ of attachment (Misc. Nos. 17-151 D.I. 922 ; 23-609 D.I. 38) scheduled for February 14 is also CANCELED and will be RESCHEDULED as a teleconference to be held at a time to be determined on February 27, 2024. The Special Master is directed to make reasonable effort to confer with the interested parties and submit to the Court a proposed schedule, consistent with this order, for the February 27 proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/2024. (apk) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/24 2:44 PM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the letter submitted by the Special Master (Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 871), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a Status Conference, as referenced in the Sale Procedures Order (Misc. No. 17-151 D.I. 481 para. 5), on February 14 at 10:00 a.m. in a courtroom to be determined in J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building. In advance of the Status Conference, the Special Master shall confer with the Sale Process Parties and use reasonable efforts also to confer with other interested entities and, by no later than February 12, submit to the Court an agenda for the matters he proposes be addressed at the Status Conference. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 01/24/2024. Associated Cases: 1:17-mc-00151-LPS et al.(smg) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
order
Oral Order
Wed 10/11 2:52 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Court having docketed a memorandum order today in the Crystallex Action (Misc. No. 17-151-LPS D.I. 738), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) such order shall be fully applicable in the instant action, including with respect to the setting of the Step 5 and Step 7 deadlines as well as the procedures for implementing priority of judgments; (2) any party seeking to become an Additional Judgment Creditor SHALL file on the docket of the Crystallex Action, no later than three (3) business days after entry of this oral order, a summary of the dates of all completed Steps, as outlined in the July 27 Order (docketed at Misc. No. 17-151-LPS D.I. 646 at 3-7), including supporting documentation sufficient to support the partys representations; and (3) each party seeking to become an Additional Judgment Creditor SHALL make further filings on the docket of the Crystallex Action indicating any additional Step completed no later than three (3) business days after the completion of such additional Step, including supporting documentation sufficient to support the partys representations. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2023. (apk) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
34 | 34 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the briefing and other materials submitted in two cases initiated by parties related to ConocoPhillips (see, e.g., Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 51-52, 57-58) filed in connection with applications for a writ of attachment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the applications (Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 51; Misc. No. 22-264 D.I. 22) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This is consistent with the suggestion made by ConocoPhillips in its reply brief. (See, e.g., Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 58 at 2 ("[I]t is now clear that the Court may not simply direct the Clerk of the Court to issue and serve the fi fa writs. Instead, the Court first must add ConocoPhillips' judgments as Additional Judgments under the terms of the Sale Procedures Order, then direct the Clerk to issue and serve the writs (along with reissuance of the PDVH share certificate).")) The relief that had been requested in the applications is now subsumed within the request to add ConocoPhillips' judgments as Additional Judgments pursuant to the Sale Procedures Order in Misc. No. 17-151 (Crystallex v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela), a matter on which all interested parties -- including ConocoPhillips -- will be heard on Monday, June 26, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/23. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 1:22-mc-00264-LPS (ntl) | |
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/23 9:41 AM
ORDER re (32 in 1:22-mc-00264-LPS, 61 in 1:19-mc-00342-LPS) Unopposed MOTION for Exemption of Persons From The District Court of Delaware's May 15, 2023 Standing Order on Personal Devices filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/23. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 1:22-mc-00264-LPS (ntl) |
|
order
Order
Fri 06/23 12:38 PM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the briefing and other materials submitted in two cases initiated by parties related to ConocoPhillips (see, e.g., Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 51-52, 57-58) filed in connection with applications for a writ of attachment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the applications (Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 51; Misc. No. 22-264 D.I. 22) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This is consistent with the suggestion made by ConocoPhillips in its reply brief. (See, e.g., Misc. No. 19-342 D.I. 58 at 2 ("[I]t is now clear that the Court may not simply direct the Clerk of the Court to issue and serve the fi fa writs. Instead, the Court first must add ConocoPhillips' judgments as Additional Judgments under the terms of the Sale Procedures Order, then direct the Clerk to issue and serve the writs (along with reissuance of the PDVH share certificate).")) The relief that had been requested in the applications is now subsumed within the request to add ConocoPhillips' judgments as Additional Judgments pursuant to the Sale Procedures Order in Misc. No. 17-151 (Crystallex v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela), a matter on which all interested parties -- including ConocoPhillips -- will be heard on Monday, June 26, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/23. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 1:22-mc-00264-LPS (ntl) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/22 4:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Exemption of Persons From The District Court of Delaware's May 15, 2023 Standing Order on Personal Devices - filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/22 9:34 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachary D. Rosenbaum - filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 06/22 11:09 AM
SO ORDERED, re31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachary D. Rosenbaum filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/22/23. (ntl) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
6
pgs
order
Order - Memorandum and Order
Wed 06/21 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding letter briefs to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on June 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/21/23. Associated Cases: 1:17-mc-00151-LPS et al. (ntl) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Brief - Reply
Wed 06/07 5:19 PM
REPLY BRIEF re22 MOTION for Writ re: for Issuance and Service of Writs of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
21
pgs
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Wed 05/24 4:10 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re22 MOTION for Writ re: for Issuance and Service of Writs of Fieri Facias Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Issuance of Writs Fieri Facias filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2023. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 05/15 11:35 AM
SO ORDERED, re (56 in 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 27 in 1:22-mc-00264-LPS) STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/23. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 1:22-mc-00264-LPS (ntl) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Fri 05/12 4:44 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule re (51 in 1:19-mc-00342-LPS) MOTION for Writ re: for Issuance and Service of Writs of Fieri Facias by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
8
pgs
order
Order - -Memorandum and Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/10 4:35 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Setting briefing schedules on various motions and other pending issues. An Oral Argument is set for 6/26/2023 at 10:00 AM (Courtroom to be determined). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/23. Associated Cases: 1:17-mc-00151-LPS et al. (ntl) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
7
pgs
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/08 6:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT CORRECTED VERSION by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., PDVSA Petroleo, S.A., Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A, Petroleos de Venezuela S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/08 5:12 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., PDVSA Petroleo, S.A., Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A, Petroleos de Venezuela S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
13
pgs
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 05/01 2:30 AM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re22 MOTION for Writ re: for Issuance and Service of Writs of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/15/2023. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
22 | 22
2
pgs
motion
Writ
Mon 05/01 2:24 AM
MOTION for Writ re: for Issuance and Service of Writs of Fieri Facias - filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
Thu 12/01 11:52 AM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Julia B. Mosse, formerly of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: Change Law Firm. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/24 4:25 PM
ORDER Granting in Part2 MOTION for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/22. (ntl) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 10/12 5:26 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Tue 10/11 8:50 AM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the joint status report of October 4, 2022 (D.I. 17), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) ConocoPhillips' motion for a writ fi fa (D.I. 2) is GRANTED provided that the parties meet and confer and submit, no later than October 13, 2022, a form of order the Court can sign to grant the motion solely and to the extent the Court has granted similar relief in the March 2 Order (granting relief to ConocoPhillips) and April 28 Order (granting to Red Tree Investments, LLC the same relief as the Court granted to ConocoPhillips), as these terms are defined in the joint status report, subject to PDVSA's rights of appeal and the preservation of its objections; (2) PDVSA's motion to stay (D.I. 8) is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the Third Circuit's denial of certification of an interlocutory appeal; and (3) PDVSA's cross-motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction over the subject matter (D.I. 11) is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the statements made in the joint status report and the instant order. The instant order does not create or detract from any rights ConocoPhillips may have to move to add any "Additional Judgments" to the sale of the PDVH shares in Crystallex Int'l Corp. v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Misc. No. 17-151-LPS. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/22. (ntl) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/04 1:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Thu 09/29 2:54 PM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit, no later than 2:00 pm on Tuesday, October 4, 2022, a joint status report setting out their position(s) as to how this matter should proceed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/29/22. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00290-LPS, 1:19-mc-00342-LPS, 1:22-mc-00264-LPS (ntl) |
||
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 09/21 12:56 PM
Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Garrett B. Moritz regarding ConocoPhillips' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
respm
Brief - Combined Answering and Reply
Wed 07/13 5:21 PM
BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Vacate Registered Judgment ,2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/20/2022. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
6
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/08 2:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Stay re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias PETRLEOS DE VENEZUELA, S.A.S MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS ATTACHMENT MOTION filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 06/30 9:04 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Kim, Marcus J. Green, and Lydia L. Halpern filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/22. (ntl) |
||
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
12
pgs
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Wed 06/29 5:01 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Vacate Registered Judgment ,2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/13/2022. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Wed 06/29 4:58 PM
Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Vacate Registered Judgment - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..(Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/29 10:52 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Kim, Marcus J. Green, and Lydia L. Halpern - filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Wed 06/29 3:35 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin A. Meehan, Julia B. Mosse, Juan O. Perla, and Joseph D. Pizzurro for Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/24 1:18 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro, Julia B. Mosse, Kevin A. Meehan and Juan O. Perla of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP on behalf of Defendant, Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A. - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Nelson, Aaron) |
|
8 | 8
6
pgs
motion
Stay
Fri 06/24 1:15 PM
MOTION to Stay re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias PETRLEOS DE VENEZUELA, S.A.S MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS ATTACHMENT MOTION - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..(Nelson, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Motion to Stay | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/24 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Nelson on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Nelson, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/24 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lynne Brown on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Brown, Jamie) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/24 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Hirzel, Samuel) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Fri 06/24 2:37 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro, Julia B. Mosse, Kevin A. Meehan and Juan O. Perla of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP on behalf of Defendant, Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A. filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/22. (ntl) |
||
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/22 12:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (due to related cases). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Declaration
Wed 06/15 12:20 PM
DECLARATION re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
3 | 3
15
pgs
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Wed 06/15 12:16 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/29/2022. (Moritz, Garrett) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
motion
Writ
Wed 06/15 12:15 PM
MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias - filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V..(Moritz, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
misccs
Registration of Foreign Judgment
Wed 06/15 11:40 AM
REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff and Against Defendants in the Amount of $$48,008,707 ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ADEDC-3896380) - filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V.(apk) |
|
Att: 1 AO 451, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 06/15 1:42 PM
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (smg) |