Andrews v. Hall
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00267
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01298 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 20, 2023 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Janet C. Hall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffrey Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2023 3:30 AM EST |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Andrews, FILED. [3334142] 22-1298 [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:50 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #8, dated 03/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3334143] 22-1298 [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:53 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Andrews, district court receipt # 25098, FILED.[3334144] 22-1298 [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:54 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334145] 22-1298 [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3334146] 22-1298 [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:57 PM] |