Andrews v. Vatti
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00332
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01301 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 20, 2023 3:42 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffrey Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2023 3:31 AM EST |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Andrews, FILED. [3334160] 22-1301 [Entered: 06/16/2022 08:59 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #9, dated 03/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3334163] 22-1301 [Entered: 06/16/2022 09:04 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334164] 22-1301 [Entered: 06/16/2022 09:04 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3334165] 22-1301 [Entered: 06/16/2022 09:06 PM] |