Michele Gray v. Fidelity
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00041
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01307 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2022 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michele Gray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/06/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray in 22-1307 FILED. [3334494] 22-1307 22-565] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:40 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER, dated 05/11/2022, RECEIVED.[3334501] 22-1307 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:45 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/12/2022, RECEIVED.[3334503] 22-1307 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:45 AM] | |
4 | 4 NOTE: See lead case, 22-565, containing complete set of docket entries.[3334505] 22-1307 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:46 AM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334512] 22-1307 [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |