Kumaran v. National Futures Association
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03668
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01314 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2023 11:17 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
National Futures Association, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe 1, Compliance Officer NFA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe 2, Compliance Officer NFA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tom Kadlec, Board Member NFA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nicole Wahls
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Vilia Sutkus-Kiela
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
National Futures Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Siva Kumaran
|
|
Plaintiff
Other similarly situated customers 1-100
|
|
Plaintiff
Other similarly situated CTA 1-100
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nefertiti Risk Capital Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Samantha Siva Kumaran
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/22/2023 7:47 AM EDT |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nefertiti Risk Capital Management, LLC, FILED. [3334805] 22-1314 [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:10 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 16 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/02/2022, RECEIVED.[3334812] 22-1314 [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:16 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334816] 22-1314 [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 27 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Mr. David Kostus, Esq. for Appellant Nefertiti Risk Capital Management, LLC, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3334864] 22-1314 [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:57 PM] |