Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:22-cv-01504
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981jb Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2022
Terminated:Mar 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2022 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Tyler Bisbee
31873 Griffith Drive
Galena, MD 21635
Represented By
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Builders FirstSource, Inc.
2001 Bryan Street Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Probuild Company, LLC
7595 Technology Way Suite 500
Denver, CO 80237
Represented By
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BFS Group, LLC
Represented By
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC
Represented By
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Terrell Brown
111 West Harvest Drive
New Castle, DE 19720
Represented By
Catherine W Smith
Derek Smith Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Danzig
Law Office Of Jeffrey S Danzig PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 03, 2023
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/03 12:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Terrell Brown(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
34 34 order Settlement Order Tue 03/07 11:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/7/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Mon 02/13 11:39 AM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 3/23/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/13/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
32 32 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/08 12:35 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving31 STATUS REPORT Joint; directing parties to provide an additional Status Report in 30 days. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/8/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Status Report Wed 02/08 10:04 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by BFS Group, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/09 11:31 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving29 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/9/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 01/09 10:27 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by BFS Group, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
28 28 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/12 11:49 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving27 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/12/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 12/09 12:11 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by BFS Group, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
order Order Wed 11/09 3:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: A settlement conference was conducted today and is being continued. The parties are to exchange documents as directed by the Court. The parties are to provide a joint status report by COB December 9, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/9/2022. (Chambers)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/14 10:57 AM
Settlement Conference held on 11/9/2022 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (kmts, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Fri 09/09 3:37 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/9/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/09 2:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/9/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
23 23 3 pgs order Order Wed 09/07 12:17 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving22 Joint Initial Report to the Court filed by Terrell Brown. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/7/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 corresp Settlement Conference - requesting Wed 09/07 10:42 AM
Settlement Conference - requesting (Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
21 21 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 08/31 4:31 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BFS Group, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Builders FirstSource, Inc., Other Affiliate BFS Operations LLC for Builders FirstSource, Inc.; Other Affiliate BFS Group LLC for BFS Group, LLC.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/30 5:26 PM
Defendant Tyler Bisbee's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Tyler Bisbee.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/24 1:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/24/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Informal Discovery Letter
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/24 11:58 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BFS Group, LLC, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 08/24 12:25 PM
Deficiency Notice for BFS Group, LLC, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Probuild Company, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/31/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/16 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Brown. Tyler Bisbee served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022.(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/12 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Brown. Probuild Company, LLC served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022.(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/12 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Brown. Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022.(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/12 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Brown. Builders FirstSource, Inc. served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022.(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/12 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrell Brown. BFS Group, LLC served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022.(Smith, Catherine)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/12 12:59 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on REBECCA GOTT on 08/03/2022, filed by Terrell Brown.(Smith, Catherine) Modified on 8/12/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/12 12:58 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on REBECCA GOTT on 08/03/2022, filed by Terrell Brown.(Smith, Catherine) Modified on 8/12/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/12 12:58 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on REBECCA GOTT on 08/03/2022, filed by Terrell Brown.(Smith, Catherine) Modified on 8/12/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/12 12:57 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on REBECCA GOTT on 8/3/2022, filed by Terrell Brown.(Smith, Catherine) Modified on 8/12/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 08/12 1:01 PM
QC NOTICE:10 Affidavit of Service filed by Terrell Brown,11 Affidavit of Service filed by Terrell Brown,9 Affidavit of Service filed by Terrell Brown,8 Affidavit of Service filed by Terrell Brown was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/30 10:09 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Catherine W Smith. Directing attorney Catherine W Smith to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/30/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/28 11:47 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/24 4:02 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Catherine W. Smith (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10012436.) by Terrell Brown(Danzig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/23 12:33 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to BFS Group, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Builders Firstsource - Atlantic Group, LLC and Probuild Company, LLC.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Thu 06/23 12:30 PM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/23/2022. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 06/23 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Terrell Brown or counsel for Terrell Brown are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/7/2022. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/20 7:13 PM
COMPLAINT against BFS GROUP, LLC, formerly known as Probuild Company, LLC, Tyler Bisbee, Builders FirstSource - Atlantic Group, LLC d/b/a Builders FirstSource, Builders FirstSource, Inc., Probuild Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10001984.), filed by Terrell Brown.(Danzig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons