Logan v. City Of Mobile et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi K Dubose |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2022 3:00 AM CST |
Defendant
City Of Mobile
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Israel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byonca Logan
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 01 2024
ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, as set out.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/1/2024. (meh) |
1. | Woman files federal lawsuit claiming abuse by Mobile Police officer (wkrg.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/25/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
order
Judgment
Mon 04/01 4:26 PM
JUDGMENT - Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants City of Mobile and Micah Israel, and against Plaintiff Byonca Logan. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/1/2024. (meh) |
|
43 | 43
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 04/01 4:18 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Summary Judgment, as set out.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/1/2024. (meh) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Reply Brief
Thu 03/14 3:38 PM
REPLY Brief filed by Defendants City Of Mobile, Michael Israel re:34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Thu 03/14 4:41 PM
REFERRAL OF42 Reply Brief to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/07 3:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Byonca Logan. (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Logan Deposition Excerpts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Israel Deposition Excerpts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. E Kiker Deposition Excerpts | ||
utility
Document Referred
Thu 03/07 3:59 PM
REFERRAL OF41 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Conventional Filing
Tue 03/05 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Conventional Filing by Byonca Logan (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
Wed 02/07 8:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting38 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time as to the Motion for Summary Judgment as follows: Plaintiff's Response shall be filed on or before 3/7/2024; and Defendants' Reply shall be filed on or before 3/14/2024. The motion shall be taken under submission on 3/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/7/24.(gcp) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/06 1:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Byonca Logan. (McCants, Terrell) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 02/06 4:08 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order on Summary Judgment - Response Time
Fri 01/26 11:13 AM
Order re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 2/15/2024. Replies to Response to S/J due by 2/22/2024. Motion to be taken under submission on 2/23/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/26/2024. (meh) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 01/26 11:08 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
utility
Document Referred
Fri 01/26 11:10 AM
REFERRAL OF36 Notice of Conventional Filing,35 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Conventional Filing
Thu 01/25 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Conventional Filing Some Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Israel, City Of Mobile re:34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Filing Exhibits
Thu 01/25 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel re:34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Logan deposition excerpts), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B-1 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B-3 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C (Israel deposition excerpts), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D-1 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D-2 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit F-1 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit G (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit G-1 (video filed conventionally), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit H (medical records), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit I (MPD document) | ||
34 | 34
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 01/25 5:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Thu 01/25 7:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting32 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/25/24. (gcp) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 01/24 10:53 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:32 MOTION for leave to Seal Document (Motion for Leave to File Evidence Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 5.2) . Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File
Tue 01/23 5:15 PM
MOTION for leave to Seal Document (Motion for Leave to File Evidence Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 5.2) filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 12/13 11:56 AM
Order re:29 Status Report filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. Settlement Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. All parties, including the person with ultimate settlement authority for entity parties, and their lead counsel are ORDERED TO APPEAR for this settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/13/2023. (meh) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order - Document NOTED
Fri 12/01 5:08 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Joint Position Statement Regarding Settlement29 . As per the parties' request, the Court will contact the attorneys via email to schedule a settlement conference at a mutually convenient time. (lto) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Fri 12/01 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Position Statement Regarding Settlement-request settlement conference) by Michael Israel, City Of Mobile. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Fri 12/01 5:01 PM
REFERRAL OF29 Status Report to Judge Murray. (meh) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 11/08 8:05 AM
HIPAA Order in a Civil Action entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/7/2023. (meh) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Tue 11/07 1:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Qualified HIPAA Protective Order) filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Qualified HIPAA Protective Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 11/07 1:25 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:27 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Qualified HIPAA Protective Order). Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (jmr) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Mon 10/16 3:52 PM
Notice of Filing Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/10 11:31 PM
NOTICE by Byonca Logan NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Wed 10/04 2:29 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Notice of Plaintiff filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Tue 09/12 5:19 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Tue 07/18 4:52 PM
Notice of Filing (1) City of Mobile responses to Plaintiff 1st Interrogatories and Requests for Production; (2) Israel response to Plaintiff 1st Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 03/30 3:31 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Protective Order. Protective Order entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/30/2023. (meh) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Protective Order
Wed 03/29 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed protective order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 03/29 5:01 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Fri 03/03 4:55 PM
Notice of Filing First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/08 1:21 PM
NOTICE by Byonca Logan Of Discovery Requests Service (McCants, Terrell) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/08 1:16 PM
NOTICE by Byonca Logan Of Initial Disclosure served (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Tue 02/07 5:06 PM
Notice of Filing Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/07 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Jury Selection set for 7/2/2024 at 08:45 AM before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Trial to take place in the month of July 2024. ETT 2-3 days. Discovery cutoff 12/1/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2023. Motions due by 1/25/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/1/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/7/2023. (meh) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Pretrial Order | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 02/07 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Scheduling Conference held on 2/7/2023. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Case Transferred
Mon 02/06 12:19 PM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/25 5:51 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Of Telephonic Attendance to Scheduling Conference (McCants, Terrell) |
|
11 | 11
utility
Remark
Wed 01/25 9:31 AM
Remark, pursuant to Doc. Entry 10: Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment, attached (eec) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 01/24 5:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On January 24, 2023, the parties filed their9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference on February 7, 2023, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Out of town counsel may attend the scheduling conference by telephone in lieu of attendance in person by filing a notice with the Court and using the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN NO.: 571-353-2301 and Guest ID: 002111803. As previously advised, this action has been assigned to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Doc. 2). Unless a Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge is sent by email to Edwina_Crawford@ alsd.uscourts.gov, prior to February 7, 2023, the undersigned will accept the parties' actions as implied consent and treat this as a consent case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). See Roell v. Withrow, 538 U.S. 580, 590 (2003); Chambless v. Louisiana-Pacific Corp., 481 F.3d 1345, 1350-51 (11th Cir. 2007). If no party requests reassignment, the Court requests that the parties sign and file the Court's form Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge on or before February 7, 2023. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to each party a Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge form and a Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/24/23. (lto) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 01/24 5:07 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/13 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Burns-Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Burns-Brown, Christine) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/13 9:50 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Michael Israel. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/13 9:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by City Of Mobile. (Johnson, Taylor) |
|
Saturday, September 10, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sat 09/10 9:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Byonca Logan. Michael Israel served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022 (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/07 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to City Of Mobile, Michael Israel. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
Wed 07/06 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Byonca Logan (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/24 11:15 AM
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/23 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Receipt number AALSDC-3028895, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Byonca Logan. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/21/2022. (McCants, Terrell) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet |