Marshall v. National Bank of Middlebury
Original Case: 5:19-cv-00246
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01323 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 18, 2023 3:27 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
National Bank of Middlebury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bruce R. Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeanine Weir
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/18/2023 3:25 AM EST |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce R. Marshall and Jeanine Weir, FILED. [3335939] 22-1323 [Entered: 06/22/2022 08:19 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/18/2022, RECEIVED.[3335944] 22-1323 [Entered: 06/22/2022 08:28 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/18/2022, RECEIVED.[3335945] 22-1323 [Entered: 06/22/2022 08:28 AM] |