Red Hook Container Terminal, LLC v. South Pacific Shipping Co. Ltd.
Original Case: 1:15-cv-01483
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01328 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 16, 2022 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
South Pacific Shipping Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Ecuadorian Line, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Red Hook Container Terminal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Red Hook Container Terminal, LLC, FILED. [3336200] 22-1328 [Entered: 06/22/2022 11:12 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 20 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 10 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER, dated 05/18/2022, RECEIVED.[3336260] 22-1328 [Entered: 06/22/2022 11:32 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 06/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3336310] 22-1328 [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:05 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Red Hook Container Terminal, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26297913, FILED.[3336311] 22-1328 [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:06 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3336346] 22-1328 [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:31 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 19 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |