Parker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Original Case: 5:21-cv-00055
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01331 |
Type | civil / united states / social security |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 14, 2022 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Janice Parker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/14/2022 4:45 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Janice Parker, FILED. [3336382] 22-1331 [Entered: 06/22/2022 01:01 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/22/2022, RECEIVED.[3336395] 22-1331 [Entered: 06/22/2022 01:13 PM] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Janice Parker, FILED. Service date 06/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3336543] 22-1331 [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:08 PM] | |
4 | 4 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [3], on behalf of Appellant Janice Parker, FILED.[3336554] 22-1331 [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:14 PM] |