HICA Education Loan Corporation v. Greenfield
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:14-cv-02828 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 12:1821 Default of Loan by Promissary Note |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Tanya W Greenfield
|
|
Plaintiff
HICA Education Loan Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/17 8:03 AM
MARGINAL ORDER granting12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal which the court has construed as plaintiff's motion to dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/16/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/16 7:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HICA Education Loan Corporation (Glick, Jamie) |
|
Friday, December 12, 2014 | ||
Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2014 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (Court Reporter: N/A) (esp, Deputy Clerk) | ||
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Thu 12/04 10:25 AM
LETTER ORDER setting date for telephone conference for December 12, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/4/2014. (c/m 12/4/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Status Report Submitted by HICA Education Loan Corporation (Glick, Jamie) | |
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 LETTER ORDER directing parties to file a status report no later than November 27, 2014; directing that all deadlines in the Scheduling Order, ECF No. 7, are suspended until further notice.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/29/2014. (c/m 10/29/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2014 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (Court Reporter: N/A) (esp, Deputy Clerk) | ||
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 LETTER ORDER scheduling Rule 16 telephone conference for October 28, 2014 at 8:30 am. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/6/2014. (c/m 10/6/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
7 | 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/23/2015. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/6/2014.(c/m 10/6/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/6/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk). | |
Att: 1 Discovery Order | ||
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Tanya W Greenfield.(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HICA Education Loan Corporation. Tanya W Greenfield served on 9/8/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Glick, Jamie) | |
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HICA Education Loan Corporation identifying Other Affiliate HICA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Navient Corporation for HICA Education Loan Corporation.. (Glick, Jamie) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Tanya W Greenfield. (rss, Deputy Clerk) | |
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by HICA Education Loan Corporation was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure of Corporate Interest must be filed separately. The Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent/affiliations need to be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. (rss, Deputy Clerk) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Tanya W Greenfield ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-4950661.), filed by HICA Education Loan Corporation.(Glick, Jamie) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Corporate Disclosure |