Peterson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Original Case: 3:20-cv-00781
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01343 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 24, 2022 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alyssa S. Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/06/2023 9:01 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ms. Alyssa S. Peterson, FILED. [3337002] 22-1343 [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:47 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING ON PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, dated 05/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3337012] 22-1343 [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:51 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3337014] 22-1343 [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:52 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
7 | 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ms. Alyssa S. Peterson, district court receipt # HFD19136, FILED.[3340491] 22-1343 [Entered: 06/30/2022 06:53 AM] |