Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:22-cv-02485
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Re-opened:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County, CV-22-003521
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 4:21 AM EST
Defendant
MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL BOOTIER
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORP. 1 THROUGH 10
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Defendant
XYZ CO. 1 THROUGH 10
Plaintiff
ANDREA SUMMERS
Represented By
PIAYON LASSANAH
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 04/23 10:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/23/24. 4/24/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/22 4:58 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC. (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 04/12 11:35 AM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, NO LATER THAN 4/22/24, THE PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE A STATUS UPDATE REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE ARBITRATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/12/24. 4/12/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/16 4:57 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE STATUS FOR NO MORE THAN SIX MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER UNLESS CONTINUED IN SUSPENSE STATUS BY FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/16/24. 1/16/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Thu 12/21 4:34 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC. (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/21 3:09 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE FOR NO MORE THAN SIX MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER UNLESS CONTINUED IN SUSPENSE STATUS BY FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/21/23. 6/21/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Status Conference Wed 06/21 2:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTONin Courtroom 16B. Re: A Status Conference was held on 6/21/23. Court Reporter: Maureen McHugh. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 06/20 10:26 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC, ANDREA SUMMERS. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 06/14 3:33 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/21/23 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 16B BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/12 3:15 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE FOR NO MORE THAN SIX MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER UNLESS CONTINUED IN SUSPENSE STATUS BY FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/12/22. 12/12/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Thu 07/28 10:13 AM
ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS STAYED PENDING THE CONCLUSION OF ARBITRATION AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/28/22. 7/28/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 07/27 4:49 PM
STIPULATION to Stay and Submit to Arbitration by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC. (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 07/20 1:30 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including HCR III Healthcare, LLC with Certificate of Service by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC.(BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
7 7 notice Certificate of Counsel Tue 07/19 10:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF MERIT by PIAYON LASSANAH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LASSANAH, PIAYON)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
6 6 misc Jury Demand Fri 07/08 3:17 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC. (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
misc State Court Record Thu 07/07 4:52 PM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County. (ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 07/06 9:40 AM
ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 7/15/22, PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/6/22. 7/6/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
3 3 misc Stipulation Fri 07/01 4:29 PM
STIPULATION by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC. (BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
2 2 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/28 9:55 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 8/3/22 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/27/22. 6/28/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Fri 06/24 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16005438), filed by MANOR CARE OF YEADON PA LLC.(BOOTIER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form