California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:22-cv-04352
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps
Plaintiff
Simple Design Ltd.
Represented By
David Samuel Silver
Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 07, 2023
44 44 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 12/07 4:38 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment,
Att: 2 Minute In Chambers Closing Case
43 43 order Dismissing Case Thu 12/07 4:24 PM
In Chamber by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Case should have been closed on entry dated 09/18/202342 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
42 42 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 09/19 10:03 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that:Defendant, its affiliates, officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys,confederates, and all persons acting for, with, by, through, under or in activeconcert with them be permanently enjoined and restrained. See Judgment for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Default Judgment Tue 09/19 9:42 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt.39 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
40 40 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/09 11:46 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion39 set for Monday, August 14, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
39 39 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/14 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Funsol Technologies PVT Ltd dba Media Studio Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Astral IP Enterprise Ltd., Simple Design Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' Rule 55(b) Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of D. Silver in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, July 03, 2023
38 38 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 07/03 12:44 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Defendant Funsol Technologies Pvt. Ltd. Pursuant to Court's Order37 . (jp)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Clerk to Enter Default Mon 07/03 12:35 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion for Entry of Default (Dkt.36 ). The Clerk is ordered to enter the default of Defendant Funsol Technologies Pvt. Ltd., in this case. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
36 36 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 06/20 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Funsol Technologies Pvt Ltd, Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps filed by Plaintiffs Simple Design Ltd., Astral IP Enterprise Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of David Silver in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
35 35 misc Declaration Wed 05/24 4:15 PM
DECLARATION of David Silver re Order on Motion for Order,34 , Amended Complaint/Petition28 , Summons Issued32 Proof Of Service filed by Plaintiffs Astral IP Enterprise Ltd., Simple Design Ltd..(Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of David Silver
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
34 34 order For Order Tue 05/09 12:18 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer on Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service33 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3), that the Plaintiff may serve the Defendant by: (1) messaging Defendant via email. (See Order for specifics). (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
33 33 3 pgs motion Order Mon 04/17 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Alternative Service filed by Plaintiff Astral IP Enterprise Ltd., Simple Design Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attorney David Samuel Silver added to party Astral IP Enterprise Ltd.(pty:pla)) (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service,
Att: 2 Declaration of D. Silver in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Defendant's Mobile Application Page on the Google Play Store,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Developer Page Users are Redirected to,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 Google Maps redirection,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 February 15, 2022 email correspondence,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 April 5, 2023 Active use of the email address,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 Email correspondence with Defendant,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 March 30, 2023 Email correspondence with Defendant,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 Error Message regarding full mailbox,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 Pakistan Diplomatic Declaration,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
32 32 service Summons Issued Tue 03/28 11:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint28 as to Funsol Technologies Pvt Ltd dba Media Studio Inc, a Pakistan private limited company. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
31 31 notice Summons Request Mon 03/27 10:12 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition28 filed by Plaintiff Astral IP Enterprise Ltd., Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2023
30 30 notice Deficiency in Summons Sat 03/25 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request29 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:"section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. Next to SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, please add - on the First Amended Complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
29 29 notice Summons Request Fri 03/24 5:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition28 filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
28 28 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 03/24 5:23 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.(Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
27 27 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 03/15 4:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Plaintiffs requests for additional time to file an amended complaint and to file a request for alternative service is GRANTED. Plaintiff is to file these items no later than April 17, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
26 26 misc Response Tue 03/14 11:16 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.to Order,25 re Lack of Prosecution (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/13 2:11 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Lack of Prosecution of Case. In light of all of this, the default that was entered in this action is vacated. Plaintiff is to provide adequate proof of service or a request for an extension of time to serve no later than 3/20/2023. Failure to do so will result is dismissal of the case without prejudice. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
24 24 misc Declaration Thu 12/29 3:04 PM
DECLARATION of David Silver re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),,14 filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd..(Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of David Silver
Monday, November 21, 2022
23 23 order Default Judgment Mon 11/21 10:35 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt.21 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/16 10:06 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion21 set for Monday, November 21, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
21 21 motion Default Judgment Tue 10/18 7:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
20 20 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Tue 10/11 6:20 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document No.15 was not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 09/30 11:32 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The court deems the response to the Court's Order to Show Cause satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 09/27 12:06 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
17 17 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 09/22 4:13 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Silver
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
16 16 misc Response Wed 09/21 2:08 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.to Order to Show Cause15 (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/19 2:27 PM
Order to Show Cause by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution as to Media Studio Inc -- All Video Downloader Apps. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 08/26 2:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd., upon Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Umar Farooq - Operation Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Email service per agreement of parties)(Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Email Correspondence),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Email Service of Summons and Complaint)
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/29 8:54 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Wed 06/29 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the incorrect magistrate judge's name was indicated on the Notice of Assignment. The correct magistrate judge's name is Margo A. Rocconi. See the corrected Notice of Assignment as Attachment 1. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/29 1:34 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The ex parte application for alternative service6 is stricken. The request should have been filed as a noticed motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 6/29/2022 (pk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/28 9:44 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Media Studio Inc - All Video Downloader Apps. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 06/27 5:17 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 06/27 5:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 06/27 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
6 6 motion Service by Publication Fri 06/24 5:20 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Service by Publication (Alternative Service) filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Silver,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to DSilver Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to DSilver Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to DSilver Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to DSilver Declaration,
Att: 6 Proposed Order (word version to be submitted after assignment of Judge)
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Fri 06/24 5:13 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/24 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd., identifying Leap Fitness Group as dba of Plaintiff. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 06/24 5:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/24 5:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Silver, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/24 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33525976 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Simple Design Ltd.. (Attorney David Samuel Silver added to party Simple Design Ltd.(pty:pla))(Silver, David)
Related: [-]