Partner Reinsurance Company Ltd. v. RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Original Case: 1:18-cv-05831
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01358 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Erwin Robert Hirt
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Tracey Hirt
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
The Robert Hirt and Tracey Najarian Hirt Revocable Living Trust
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
RPM Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
LendUS, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Partner Reinsurance Company Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/31/2022 4:35 AM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant LendUS, L.L.C. and RPM Mortgage, Inc., FILED. [3337840] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:43 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 32 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3337846] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:47 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3337848] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:48 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant LendUS, L.L.C. and RPM Mortgage, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-26322383, FILED.[3337850] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:49 PM] | |
5 | 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven L. Caponi, Esq. for Appellant RPM Mortgage, Inc. and LendUS, L.L.C., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3337853] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:51 PM] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3339772] 22-1358 [Entered: 06/29/2022 09:04 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 32 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |