Investment Science LLC v. Oath Holdings Inc.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-08159
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01363 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2022 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Verizon Media, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Oath Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Verizon Communications Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Oath Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Investment Science LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/17/2022 4:32 AM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Investment Science LLC, FILED. [3338184] 22-1363 [Entered: 06/27/2022 08:52 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3338189] 22-1363 [Entered: 06/27/2022 08:58 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Investment Science LLC, district court receipt # BNYSDC-26327591, FILED.[3338193] 22-1363 [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:00 AM] |