Boyde v. Fahey
Original Case: 5:21-cv-01277
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01367 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 21, 2022 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph E. Fahey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Johnny William Boyde, AKA Johnny W. Boyde
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/21/2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Johnny William Boyde, FILED. [3338530] 22-1367 [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:19 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3338539] 22-1367 [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:26 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3338544] 22-1367 [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:30 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |