Rodriguez v. Ridge Pizza Inc.
Original Case: 2:16-cv-00254
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01371 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 08, 2022 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Velia D'Onofrio
|
|
Defendant
Philip D'Onofrio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dennis D'Onofrio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ridge Restaurant, Inc., DBA Alfredo's Pizzeria
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Philip D'Onofrio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Rodriguez
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Aristides Alfredo Dillatoro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2022 3:30 AM EST |
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Aristides Alfredo Dillatoro, FILED. [3338843] 22-1371 [Entered: 06/27/2022 04:55 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 06/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3338851] 22-1371 [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:01 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Aristides Alfredo Dillatoro, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15693677, FILED.[3338852] 22-1371 [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:02 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3338853] 22-1371 [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:03 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |