New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:22-cv-04320
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Mar 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
LOUIS P. DIGIAIMO
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Plaintiff
APRIL MERRITT
Represented By
LINDA MAALOUF LOPEZ
Law Offices Of Eric A. Shore
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 03, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/03 11:00 AM
CONSENT ORDER of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/3/2023. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 03/31 1:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (DIGIAIMO, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Fri 03/03 11:38 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/2/2023. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/3/2023. (kas, )
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 03/03 12:31 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2023, in person. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/06 12:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting defendant's request, with consent, and adjourning the Settlement Conference to 3/3/2023 at 9:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Prior to appearing, counsel are encouraged to check the Court's website for the status of any COVID-19 precautions required in the courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/6/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/30 12:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting defendant's request, with consent, and adjourning the Settlement Conference to 2/9/2023 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Prior to appearing, counsel are encouraged to check the Court's website for the status of any COVID-19 precautions required in the courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/30/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/12 12:56 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 1/31/2022 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Prior to appearing, counsel are encouraged to check the Court's website for the status of any COVID-19 precautions required in the courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/12/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 12/12 12:52 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/12/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 10/12 2:57 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Telephone Status Conference set for 12/12/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/12/2022. (mg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 11/01 5:39 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/11/2022, via telephone. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 09/12 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 10/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/12/2022. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/07 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(DIGIAIMO, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/20 2:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by APRIL MERRITT. APRIL MERRITT waiver sent on 6/30/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (LOPEZ, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/29 1:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/29 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13524936), filed by APRIL MERRITT.(LOPEZ, LINDA)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/29 1:04 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
Related: [-]