11
|
|
11
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Tue 01/17 4:39 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 12/14 3:52 PM
NOTICE by Daphne Bell (Schwartz, Carl)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/05 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/10/2023 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/13/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2023 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 12/13/2023 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. Related [+] (WBar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Thu 11/10 9:51 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Schwartz, Carl)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/14 9:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trident Asset Management, LLC. (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Letter
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 10/14 9:56 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trident Asset Management, LLC (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Appearance
Fri 10/14 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Shaver on behalf of Trident Asset Management, LLC. (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Appearance
Fri 10/14 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Turner on behalf of Trident Asset Management, LLC. (Turner, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Text-Only Order
Fri 10/14 2:49 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties are ordered to review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and FILE a Joint Discovery Plan with the Court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f)(3), on or before 11/10/2022. The Court will review the plan and determine whether to set a scheduling conference or enter a scheduling order based upon the filed plan. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Tue 08/16 2:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Daphne Bell waiver sent on 8/15/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Zemel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued*
Thu 06/30 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Trident Asset Management, LLC * (SKra)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Thu 06/30 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Daphne Bell against Trident Asset Management, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8964430 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Schwartz, Carl)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 06/30 1:26 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]
|