Masciotta v. The Clarkstown Central School District et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-07128 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 10:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Susan Gold
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary Kay Humenn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carol Napier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Clarkstown Central School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Masciotta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
14 | 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. (Cardoso, Anthony) | |
13 | 13 DECLARATION of Anthony F. Cardoso in Support re:12 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District.(Cardoso, Anthony) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Federal Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Claim | ||
12 | 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. Responses due by 1/30/2015(Cardoso, Anthony) | |
Wednesday, November 19, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER: At the Pre-Motion Conference held before the Court on November 18, 2014, the Court adopted the following scheduling order: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by no later than January 9, 2015. Plaintiff shall file opposition papers by no later than January 30, 2015. Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion by no later than February 13, 2015. Sur-reply papers will not be accepted unless prior permission of the Court is given. Counsel are reminded that there is a strict page limit, which will be extended only in extreme circumstances. Any pending deadlines found in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or in any applicable statute are hereby stayed until the date the motions are due. Courtesy copies are to be served upon all counsel by the assigned date. One courtesy copy of all papers also shall be sent to the Court at the time they are served upon opposing counsel. If oral argument is requested, it may be scheduled by the Court. Please wait to hear from the Court to schedule argument. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/9/2015. Responses due by 1/30/2015. Replies due by 2/13/2015.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/19/2014) (lnl) | |
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/18/2014. Joseph DeMatteo and Jeff Bernfeld for Plaintiff. Anthony Cardoso for Defendant. No court reporter served. The Court set a briefing schedule. See Order. (lnl) | ||
Thursday, October 30, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph R. DeMatteo dated October 29, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on November 17, 2014, at 11:30. So Ordered. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/17/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/30/2014) (lnl) | |
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph R. DeMatteo dated October 29, 2014 re:8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam I. Kleinberg dated 10/24/2014. . Document filed by Tracy Masciotta. (DeMatteo, Joseph) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam I. Kleinberg dated 10/24/2014. Document filed by Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District.(Kleinberg, Adam) | |
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Francisco Cardoso on behalf of Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. (Cardoso, Anthony) | |
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) | ||
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (pgu) | ||
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Response (non-motion)
Wed 09/10 4:06 PM
FIRST RESPONSE re:4 Letter requesting change of venue. . Document filed by Tracy Masciotta. (DeMatteo, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/10 3:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Tracy Masciotta. (DeMatteo, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 09, 2014 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Tue 09/09 11:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Adam I. Kleinberg dated September 9, 2014 re: Change of Venue. Document filed by Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District.(Kleinberg, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/09 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. (Kleinberg, Adam) |
|
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (laq). | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401104122)Document filed by Tracy Masciotta.(moh) (laq). | |
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Gold, Mary Kay Humenn, Carol Napier, The Clarkstown Central School District. (moh) | ||
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (moh) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (moh) |