Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:22-mc-00006
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2022
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 12, 2022
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/13 6:22 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re DN5 . Mail sent to Defendant Mustafa Shaknlyeu. (SRH)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/13 12:20 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re5 . Mail sent to Yusuf Mamedov. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/17 3:16 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/14/2022. Yusuf Mamedov and Mustafa Shakniyeu ARE COMPELLED TO AND SHALL COMPLY with the 6/7/2022 subpoenas served upon them no later than thirty days after entry of the instant order. Mamedov and Shakniyeu are warned that failure to comply with the subpoenas and instant order may result in them being held in contempt of court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(g). cc: Counsel, Defendants (certified mail) (SMJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Supplement Order on Motion to Compel Mon 10/17 11:48 AM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/14/2022. The Clerk is directed to amend the case caption to reflect the Plaintiff as being "Landstar Ranger, Inc." and the Defendants as being "Yusuf Mamedov" and "Mustafa Shakniyeu." The Clerk shall terminate "UIH Technologies LLC" and "Kuehne + Nagel, Inc." as Parties to this action. Landstar's Motion to Compel (DN1 ), as supplemented (DN4 ), is GRANTED, and the Court will issue a separate order compelling Mamedov and Shakniyeu to comply with the issued subpoenas (DNs1 -2,1 -3) within thirty days of entry of the Court's order. cc: Counsel, Mamedov/Shakniyeu (certified mail) (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
4 4 motion Supplement Thu 08/11 4:07 PM
MOTION to Supplement re1 Motion to Compel by ThirdParty Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc. (Zipperle, Gene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavits, Proof of Service & Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Corrected Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - GWW Supplement Declaration
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/02 3:36 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/2/2022 re1 MOTION to Compel filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Landstar shall file a supplement to its motion by 8/16/2022.cc:counsel (JWM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
order Order - TEXT ONLY Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY Fri 07/15 10:11 AM
TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/15/2022; re1 MOTION to Compel filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. referring Motion:1 MOTION to Compel filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. to Colin H. Lindsay-- pursuant to 28 USC§ 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay.Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel, CM-CHL and CHL Chambers. (ARM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
1 1 motion Compel Wed 07/06 4:13 PM
MOTION to Compel by ThirdParty Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc (CDL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supporting Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - YM Subpoena,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - MS Subpoena,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Email GW to YM,
Att: 5 Proposed Order