Hawaii District Court
Judge:Jill A Otake
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:22-cv-00309
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2022
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2023 10:30 PM HST
Counter Claimant
GM Realty, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Adrian Kamstra
Torkildson Katz
contact info
Abigail Marie Holden
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Brian W. Tilker
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
GM Realty, Inc.
Represented By
Abigail Marie Holden
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Brian W. Tilker
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Giro Katsimbrakis
Represented By
David Andrew Robyak
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
Robert G. Klein
Klein Law Group Lllc
contact info
Kurt W. Klein
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
James M. Yuda
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
Defendant
Tycon 151, LLC
Represented By
A. Bernard Bays
Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher
contact info
Defendant
Shelby Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Adrian Kamstra
Torkildson Katz
contact info
Abigail Marie Holden
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Brian W. Tilker
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Defendant
New Paradigm Financial, Inc.
Defendant
GM Realty, Inc.
Represented By
Abigail Marie Holden
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Brian W. Tilker
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Defendant
GM Realty Property Management, Inc.
Defendant
Tycon Properties, Inc.
Defendant
St. Louis Redevelopment Company, LLC
Represented By
David Andrew Robyak
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
Robert G. Klein
Klein Law Group Lllc
contact info
Kurt W. Klein
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
James M. Yuda
Klein Law Group, Lllc
contact info
Defendant
STL 100, LLC
Represented By
A. Bernard Bays
Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher
contact info
Defendant
Bert Miller
Represented By
Jacob Adrian Kamstra
Torkildson Katz
contact info
Abigail Marie Holden
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Brian W. Tilker
Cox Fricke LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
Doe Unincorporated Organizations 1-10
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
Defendant
Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
Defendant
Lorraine Conaway
Represented By
A. Bernard Bays
Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher
contact info
Defendant
James Conaway
Represented By
A. Bernard Bays
Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher
contact info
Defendant
Tyler Banta
Plaintiff
WenDee Eng
Represented By
David F. Day
Law Office Of David F. Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Barton Eng
Represented By
David F. Day
Law Office Of David F. Day
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Tycon, LLC
Terminated: 08/05/2022
Defendant
Shelby Holdings, Inc.
Terminated: 08/05/2022
Defendant
NPF Plus Smart Tax Hawaii, LLC
Terminated: 08/05/2022
Defendant
GM Realty Management, Inc.
Terminated: 08/05/2022
Defendant
Blue Pacific Solution Group
Terminated: 08/05/2022

GPO Jun 30 2023
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 78 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/30/2023.  For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction over the Movant Defendants. Because Plaintiffs may be able to rehabilitate their claims if they can offer greater details regarding the Movant Defendants' minimum contacts with this forum, the Court also grants LEAVE TO AMEND. In so doing, however, the Court notes that the SAC's deficiencies were not limited solely to a failure to offer sufficient facts regarding personal jurisdiction over the Movant Defendants; as mentioned above, each of the claims also lacked sufficient allegations to state a claim. A Third Amended Complaint must be filed on or before July 21, 2023 and cannot include new claims or new defendants without leave of court. (jni)
GPO Jun 30 2023
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT EWELL D. MILLER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 86 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/30/2023.  For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Motion for Summary Judgment as follows:  1. The Court GRANTS Miller's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Misrepresentation and Fraud claims and thus DISMISSES the Misrepresentation and Fraud claims against Defendant Miller.  2. The Court DENIES Miller's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Enforcement of Promissory Note and UDAP claims, which are the only claims remaining against Defendant Miller. (jni)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM HST
Thursday, May 01, 2025
198 198 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 05/01 12:41 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (cib)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
197 197 misc Request Wed 04/30 3:59 PM
REQUEST Defendants Giro Katsimbrakis and St. Louis Redevelopment Company LLC's Request for Entry of Final Judgment by Doe Corporations 1-10.(Robyak, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of David Robyak, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A