Crapps v. WC Holding, Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Liam O'Grady |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01138 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 - Diversity: Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 2:50 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sentel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WC Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell T. Wright
|
|
Plaintiff
Darrell L. Crapps
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 10, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 2 pgs So Ordered re12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Darrell L. Crapps. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/10/2014. (jlan) | |
Wednesday, October 08, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 3 pgs NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Darrell L. Crapps (McWilliams, O'Kelly) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Scully, Jr on behalf of Sentel Corporation, WC Holding, Inc. (Scully, Robert) | |
Friday, September 26, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 09/26/2014. (jlan) | |
9 | 9 ORDERED, that the WC Holdings, Inc. and Sentel Corporation's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before October 10,2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 09/26/2014. (jwil, ) | |
8 | 8 Consent MOTION for Extension , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Darrell L. Crapps.(McWilliams, O'Kelly) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 25, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion (1) To Remove Exhibit C and Exhibit E From the Complaint for Damages And Declaratory Judgment and (II) To Substitute The Correct Documents by Darrell L. Crapps.(McWilliams, O'Kelly) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kwang-Min Kim on behalf of Sentel Corporation, WC Holding, Inc. (Kim, Michael) | |
Tuesday, September 23, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion To Remove Exhibit C and Exhibit E From the Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Judgment by Darrell L. Crapps.(McWilliams, O'Kelly) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Sentel Corporation served on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014. (jlan) | |
Tuesday, September 09, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed WC Holding, Inc. served on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014 (jlan) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Sentel Corporation, WC Holding, Inc., Russell T. Wright. For service by process server. (rban, ) | |
1 | 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT against Sentel Corporation, WC Holding, Inc., Russell T. Wright ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683046109.), filed by Darrell L. Crapps.(rban, ) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/29/2014) (jlan, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/29/2014) (jlan, )(Exhibit C and E were replaced pursuant to court order dated 09/26/2014. (Entered: 09/09/2014) | |
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 18 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 5 pgs Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Receipt |