Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc. et al v. Delaware Department of Safety and Homeland Security et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00951 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Delaware Department of Safety and Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathy Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nathanial McQueen, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Col. Melissa Zebley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce C. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank M. Nedza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DJJAMS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bridgeville Rifle & Pistol Club, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vickie Lynn Prickett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Madonna M. Nedza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James E. Hosfelt, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delaware Rifle and Pistol Club
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delaware Association of Federal Firearms Licensees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecil Curtis Clements
|
Represented By
|
1. | Delaware gun groups file federal lawsuit against assault weapons ban (delawareonline.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/25/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
67 | 67
5
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/12 10:03 AM
SO ORDERED Granting66 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Action Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2023. (nms) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Tue 04/11 4:36 PM
Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Action Pending Appeal, by Delaware Department of Safety and Homeland Security, Kathy Jennings, Nathanial McQueen, Jr, Melissa Zebley. (Ross, David) Modified on 4/11/2023 (nms) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
65 | 65
appeal
- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit
Fri 04/07 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re61 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Christopher Graham, Owen Stevens, Second Amendment Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. USCA Case Number 23-1634 USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk) |
|
64 | 64
appeal
- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit
Fri 04/07 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re62 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit),, filed by Delaware Rifle and Pistol Club, Frank M. Nedza, Bridgeville Rifle & Pistol Club, Ltd., DJJAMS LLC, Madonna M. Nedza, Bruce C. Smith, Owen Stevens, Vickie Lynn Prickett, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Cecil Curtis Clements, James E. Hosfelt, Jr., Christopher Graham, Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc., Gabriel Gray, Delaware Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Second Amendment Foundation, William Taylor. USCA Case Number 23-1641 USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk) |
|
63 | 63
appeal
- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit
Fri 04/07 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re60 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Gabriel Gray, Second Amendment Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., DJJAMS LLC, William Taylor. USCA Case Number 23-1633 USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
62 | 62
appeal
- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit
Thu 04/06 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of59 Order. Appeal filed by Bridgeville Rifle & Pistol Club, Ltd., Cecil Curtis Clements, DJJAMS LLC, Delaware Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Delaware Rifle and Pistol Club, Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Christopher Graham, Gabriel Gray, James E. Hosfelt, Jr, Frank M. Nedza, Madonna M. Nedza, Vickie Lynn Prickett, Second Amendment Foundation, Bruce C. Smith, Owen Stevens, William Taylor.(Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 4/6/2023 (nms) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
appeal
- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)
Thu 04/06 2:33 PM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment received re62 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit),, filed by Delaware Rifle and Pistol Club, Frank M. Nedza, Bridgeville Rifle & Pistol Club, Ltd., DJJAMS LLC, Madonna M. Nedza, Bruce C. Smith, Owen Stevens, Vickie Lynn Prickett, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Cecil Curtis Clements, James E. Hosfelt, Jr., Christopher Graham, Delaware State Sportsmen's Association, Inc., Gabriel Gray, Delaware Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Second Amendment Foundation, William Taylor. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-4107341.) (Pileggi, Francis) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
61 | 61
appeal
- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit
Wed 04/05 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of59 Order . Appeal filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Christopher Graham, Second Amendment Foundation, Owen Stevens.(Lehman, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
60 | 60
appeal
- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit
Wed 04/05 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of59 Order . Appeal filed by DJJAMS LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gabriel Gray, Second Amendment Foundation, William Taylor.(Lehman, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
appeal
- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)
Wed 04/05 5:04 PM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment received re60 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Gabriel Gray, Second Amendment Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., DJJAMS LLC, William Taylor. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-4106651.) (Lehman, Bradley) |
||
appeal
- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)
Wed 04/05 5:06 PM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment received re61 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Christopher Graham, Owen Stevens, Second Amendment Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-4106656.) (Lehman, Bradley) |