BHH LLC et al v. Kenu, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-07265 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 8:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kenu, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BHH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 03/17 11:40 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 5:15-cv-01107, filed on 03/13/2015. (sjo) |
||
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
10
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 03/02 10:53 AM
OPINION AND ORDER. Kenu's motion to transfer this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 (Dkt. No. 10) is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. So ordered. re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Kenu, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/27/2015) (rjm) |
|
Thursday, October 30, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 10/30 5:47 PM
DECLARATION of Craig C. Crockett (Supplemental) in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Hall, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 10/30 5:41 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California . . Document filed by Kenu, Inc.. (Hall, Marcus) |
|
Tuesday, October 21, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/21 5:36 PM
DECLARATION of Steven Mishan in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by BHH LLC, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (Notaro, Angelo) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/21 5:36 PM
DECLARATION of Lee Ayoob in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by BHH LLC, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (Notaro, Angelo) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/21 5:34 PM
DECLARATION of Angelo Notaro in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by BHH LLC, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (Notaro, Angelo) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/21 5:33 PM
DECLARATION of Bradley S. Corsello in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by BHH LLC, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (Notaro, Angelo) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/21 5:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California . . Document filed by BHH LLC, E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.. (Notaro, Angelo) |
|
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/17 11:53 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MARCUS T. HALL granting7 Motion for Marcus T. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and there being no opposition, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/16/2014) (kgo) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/17 11:49 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF WILLIAM SLOAN COATS granting8 Motion for William Sloan Coats to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and there being no opposition, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/16/2014) (kgo) Modified on 10/17/2014 (kgo). |
|
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 10/07 6:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Howard Shin dated October 7, 2014 re: Request for Oral Argument on Kenu, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Shin, Howard) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/07 6:15 PM
DECLARATION of Craig C. Crockett in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Shin, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
12 | 12
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/07 6:11 PM
DECLARATION of Justin Cheung in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California .. Document filed by Kenu, Inc.. (Shin, Howard) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 10/07 6:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California . . Document filed by Kenu, Inc.. (Shin, Howard) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 10/07 6:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California . Document filed by Kenu, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2014(Shin, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 01, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 10/01 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kenu, Inc. served on 9/16/2014, answer due 10/7/2014. Document filed by E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.; BHH LLC. (Zaccaria, John) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Wed 10/01 8:52 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Marcus T. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10158435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 8 MOTION for William Sloan Coats to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10158448. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi) |
||
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/30 6:20 PM
MOTION for William Sloan Coats to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10158448. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Coats, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - CA, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/30 6:13 PM
MOTION for Marcus T. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10158435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Hall, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - CA, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/30 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Elizabeth Cuneo on behalf of Kenu, Inc.. (Cuneo, Lauren) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/30 6:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kenu, Inc..(Shin, Howard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/30 6:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard I. Shin on behalf of Kenu, Inc.. (Shin, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, September 09, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (laq). | |
1 | 1 32 pgs COMPLAINT against Kenu, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401104498)Document filed by E. Mishan & Sons, Inc., BHH LLC.(moh) (laq). | |
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenu, Inc.. (moh) | ||
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (moh) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (moh) |