NIZAAM v. Garland et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00870 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 29, 2023 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick Garland
Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jedidah Hussey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director of USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Washington, DC 20528
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS District Direc Sarah Taylor
2675 Prosperity Avenue
Fairfax, VA 22031 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NILOFAR NIZAAM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
So Ordered
Mon 12/19 3:47 PM
So Ordered re8 Notice of Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Merrick Garland, Sarah Taylor, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Jedidah Hussey. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 12/19/2022. (swil) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (other)
Tue 12/13 2:12 PM
NOTICE by Merrick Garland, Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Sarah Taylor of Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Chan, Hugham) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 09/01 3:01 PM
ORDER granting5 Joint Motion to Stay. ORDERED that the parties will bear their own litigation costs and attorneys' fees; it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until January 26, 2023; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not voluntarily dismiss this action on or before January 26, 2023. the parties shall file status reports With this Court every 60 days running from that date until Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses this action. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/1/2022. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/31 6:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Merrick Garland, Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Sarah Taylor (Chan, Hugham) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Wed 08/31 6:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Merrick Garland, Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Sarah Taylor.(Chan, Hugham) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 08/03 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Sarah Taylor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/02 5:03 PM
Proposed Summons by NILOFAR NIZAAM. (Anwari, Deeba) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 08/02 5:02 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by NILOFAR NIZAAM. (Anwari, Deeba) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/02 5:01 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8503734.), filed by NILOFAR NIZAAM.(Anwari, Deeba) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 08/03 9:35 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil) |