Estate of Rylan Aislee Koopmeiners et al v. Gumm et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01115 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 1:34 PM CDT |
Defendant
Care.com Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEF Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
GHI Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Gumm
|
Represented By
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
ABC Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Rylan Aislee Koopmeiners
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Koopmeiners
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reggan Koopmeiners
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Involuntary Plaintiff
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Terminated: 11/21/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
69 | 69
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 08/22 6:38 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2017. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
68 | 68
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/22 6:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2017.66 Stipulation for dismissal of defendant Care.com APPROVED; all claims against Care.com DISMISSED with prejudice, without costs to any party.67 Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal of defendant Sarah Gumm GRANTED; claims against Sarah Gumm DISMISSED without prejudice, without costs or fees to either party. Case DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Wed 08/23 8:37 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to68 Order. (amb) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
67 | 67
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/21 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Rylan Aislee Koopmeiners, Nathan Koopmeiners, Reggan Koopmeiners.(Groy, Gail) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Against Defendant, Sarah Gumm, | ||
Att: 2 Letter Judge Pepper correspondence re Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Against Defendant, Sarah Gumm | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 08/21 2:35 PM
The status conference scheduled for 8/22/2017, the final pretrial conference scheduled for 9/28/2017, and the trial scheduled for 10/23/2017 have been removed from the calendar as the parties have indicated the case has been resolved. (kgw) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
66 | 66
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/15 2:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Care.Com, Inc. with Prejudice by Estate of Rylan Aislee Koopmeiners.(Groy, Gail) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Care.Com Inc. with Prejudice |