New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. et al v. Bruen et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mae A D'Agostino |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00907 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2023 5:10 AM EST |
Defendant
Kevin P. Bruen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard J. McNally, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rodney K. Harrison
Yaphank, NY 11980
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick J. Ryder
Mineola, NY 11501
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Koch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Nash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Francis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Noren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khourly Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Stirnweis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 04/17 9:14 AM
***Answer due date updated for Rodney K. Harrison answer due 5/13/2024; Steven G. James answer due 5/13/2024; Patrick J. Ryder answer due 5/13/2024. (see) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/16 2:17 PM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot30 Motion to Dismiss: In light of the plaintiffs filing of the Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 63] on 4/16/24, the30 Motion to Dismiss, is Denied as Moot. The defendants are permitted to answer or move to dismiss the plaintiffs amended complaint on or before 5/13/24. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/16/2024. (ban) |
|
63 | 63
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/16 2:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rodney K. Harrison, Steven G. James, Patrick J. Ryder filed by Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis.(Sweeney, John) |
|
62 | 62
order
Order on Letter Request
Tue 04/16 12:56 PM
TEXT ORDER granting60 JOINT Letter Motion requesting a briefing schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants joint request for leave to file a motion to dismiss and to set the response and reply deadlines, is GRANTED; The motion to dismiss is due to be filed by 5/13/24; The plaintiffs response will be due by 6/3/24; The defendant reply deadline is set for 6/10/24. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only, unless otherwise directed by the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/16/24. (ban) |
|
61 | 61
order
Order on Letter Request
Tue 04/16 12:51 PM
TEXT ORDER granting59 Letter Motion requesting leave to file a Second Amended Complaint: IT is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs request for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED; The Amended Complaint is due by 4/19/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/16/2024. (ban) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Mon 04/15 4:19 PM
JOINT Letter Motion from Molly Thomas-Jensen for Steven G. James, Richard J. McNally, Jr. requesting a briefing schedule submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Thomas-Jensen, Molly) |
|
59 | 59
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Mon 04/15 2:58 PM
Letter Motion from John Parker Sweeney for Wayne Francis, Brandon Koch, Robert Nash, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Scott Noren, Khourly Porter, Thomas Stirnweis requesting leave to file a Second Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel .(Sweeney, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A E-Mail, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B Clean Second Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C Redline Second Amended Complaint |