Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Robert L Hinkle
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:22-cv-00325
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2022 11:10 AM EDT
Defendant
FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION
Defendant
SIMONE MARSTILLER
Plaintiff
AUGUST DEKKER
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN DOE
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN DOE
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
K. F.
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JADE LADUE
Represented By
JENNIFER G ALTMAN
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Etc Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIT ROTHSTEIN

Docket last updated: 09/28/2022 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
36 36 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/28 7:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cortlin H. Lannin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7472080.) by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, Academic Pediatric Association, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Nursing, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Osteopathic Pediatricians, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Pediatric Society, American Psychiatric Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Endocrine Society, the Florida Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, North Central Florida Council of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, Pediatric Endocrine Society, Societies for Pediatric Urology, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine, Society for Pediatric Research, Society of Pediatric Nurses, World Professional Association for Transgender Health. (LANNIN, CORTLIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/28 7:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,34 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/12/2022) . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
35 35 respoth Response/Reply Tue 09/27 3:00 PM
RESPONSE by FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION, SIMONE MARSTILLER re34 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae . (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Tue 09/27 2:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, Academic Pediatric Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Nursing, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Osteopathic Pediatricians, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Pediatric Society, Association of American Medical Colleges, Endocrine Society, the Florida Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, North Central Florida Council of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, Pediatric Endocrine Society, Societies for Pediatric Urology, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine, Society for Pediatric Research, Society of Pediatric Nurses, World Professional Association for Transgender Health, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Psychiatric Association. (LANNIN, CORTLIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS AND ADDITIONAL NATIONAL AND STATE MEDICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH ORGANIZATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Thursday, September 22, 2022
33 33 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/22 2:31 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Attorney Conference to take place by 10/24/2022 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2022 . Discovery due by 4/24/2023 . Jury Trial set for 8/7/2023 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 09/22/2022. (tpm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
32 32 3 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/20 11:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re: 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - Hearing on preliminary-injunction set for 10/12/2022 09:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. The defendants must file by 10/3/2022 , a memorandum in response to the preliminary-injunction motion. The defendants must file by 10/3/2022 , a notice stating whether they expect to offer live testimony at the hearing. The plaintiffs may file by 5:00 p.m. on 10/7/2022 , a reply memorandum and any rebuttal evidence. If, based on the defendants' filings, the plaintiffs expect to offer live testimony, they must file by 5:00 p.m. on 10/7/2022 , a notice identifying each witness and providing a brief description of the expected testimony. A witness will be allowed to testify by live transmission from a remote location if (a) both sides agree that the witness may so testify or (b) the court so orders on a motion filed by 10/3/2022 (for the defendants) or by 5:00 p.m. on 10/7/2022 (for the plaintiffs). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 09/19/2022. (tpm)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 09/19 2:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2022. Ruling by Court: Defendants' response to motion for preliminary injunction due by October 3. Plaintiffs' reply due by October 7. A preliminary injunction hearing will be set for October 12. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder, Official Court Reporter) (ckm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:58 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 17 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (CARL SOLOMON CHARLES added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:52 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 14 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (GARY JOSEPH SHAW added as an attorney for Plainitiffs)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:49 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 13 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (WILLIAM CLARKE MILLER added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:46 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 12 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (JOSEPH K LITTLE added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:40 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (ABIGAIL K COURSOLLE added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:36 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 8 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (CATHERINE ANNE MCKEE added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 11:34 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 7 , is GRANTED.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 09/15/2022. (tpm) (OMAR GONZALEZ-PAGAN added as attorney for Plaintiffs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GARY VERGIL PERKO on behalf of FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION, SIMONE MARSTILLER (PERKO, GARY)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO on behalf of FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION, SIMONE MARSTILLER (BEATO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION, SIMONE MARSTILLER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/14 7:19 AM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2022 03:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852 Access code: 3243416# Security code: 1234# Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy Markley Courtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 09/14 7:53 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re:12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7439531.),9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Coursolle.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437634.),7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Omar Gonzalez-Pagan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437127.),13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Miller.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7440081.),17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl S. Charles.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7441585.),14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary J. Shaw.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7440139.),8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine McKee.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437453.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (tpm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/13 4:07 PM
ORDER SETTING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/13/22. (sms)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/13 4:04 PM
ORDER ALLOWING 10 THE DOE PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/13/22. (sms)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/13 3:03 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl S. Charles.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7441585.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (CHARLES, CARL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/13 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by K. F., SUSAN DOE, JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN, AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/13 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by K. F., SUSAN DOE, JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN, AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. SIMONE MARSTILLER served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/13 9:19 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary J. Shaw.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7440139.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (SHAW, GARY)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/13 9:04 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Miller.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7440081.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (MILLER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 12, 2022
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/12 4:40 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7439531.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (LITTLE, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
11 11 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 09/12 3:22 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (ALTMAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 9/13/2022 (tpm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jennifer Altman (with exhibits),
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Olson-Kennedy (with exhibits),
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Karasic (with exhibits),
Att: 4 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Schechter (with exhibits),
Att: 5 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Antommaria (with exhibits),
Att: 6 Affidavit Affidavit of August Dekker,
Att: 7 Affidavit Affidavit of Brit Rothstein,
Att: 8 Affidavit Affidavit of Jane Doe,
Att: 9 Affidavit Affidavit of Jade Ladue
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/12 2:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym (UNOPPOSED) by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE. (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/12 10:57 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Coursolle.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437634.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (COURSOLLE, ABIGAIL)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/12 10:56 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine McKee.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437453.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (MCKEE, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/12 9:07 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Omar Gonzalez-Pagan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7437127.) by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE, BRIT ROTHSTEIN. (GONZALEZ-PAGAN, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/07 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to SIMONE MARSTILLER. (tpm)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/07 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION. (tpm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/07 10:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tpm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/07 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF SIMILAR ACTION by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE re1 Complaint, (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF SUMMONS by AUGUST DEKKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, SUSAN DOE, K. F., JADE LADUE re1 Complaint, (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/07 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT against FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION, SIMONE MARSTILLER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7430235.), filed by K. F., JANE DOE, AUGUST DEKKER, SUSAN DOE, JADE LADUE, JOHN DOE. (ALTMAN, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet