COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | William H Walls |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-05651 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 12:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC.
|
|
Intervenor Defendant
DDR CORP.
3300 Enterprise Parkway
Beachwood, OH 44122 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 11 2015
OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 8/11/15. (DD, ) |
|
GPO
Nov 18 2015
OPINION fld. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 11/18/15. (sr, ) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/14 10:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order
Fri 06/09 11:30 AM
ORDER extending45 Administrative Termination Order for a period of 7 days. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 6/9/17. (sr, ) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Letter
Thu 06/08 5:38 PM
Letter from Paul A. Briganti for Plaintiff Colony National Insurance Company. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order
Tue 05/09 2:33 PM
ORDER extending administration termination date for a period of 30 days. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 5/9/17. (sr, ) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/09 2:35 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/9/2017 (sr, ) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Letter
Mon 05/08 10:58 AM
Letter from Paul A. Briganti for Plaintiff Colony National Insurance Company. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order
Thu 04/06 11:14 AM
ORDER extending the administrative termination deadline w/in 30 days. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 4/6/17. (sr, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/06 11:15 AM
Reset Deadlines: Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/10/2017 (sr, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Letter
Wed 04/05 3:40 PM
Letter from Paul A. Briganti for Plaintiff Colony National Insurance Company. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 02/08 8:34 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/10/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 2/7/17. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Letter
Wed 01/11 9:45 AM
Letter from Paul A. Briganti for Plaintiff Colony National Insurance Company. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order
Mon 12/12 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 12/12/16 will be rescheduled for 12/13/16 at 9:50 AM. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/12/16. (tjg, ) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Mon 11/07 10:25 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 12/12/16 at 9:50am. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/7/16. (tjg, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 11/07 10:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2016. (tjg, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 10/04 1:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2016. (tjg, ) |
||
order
Order
Tue 10/04 1:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a brief telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 11/7/16 at 9:50am. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/4/16. (tjg, ) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order
Thu 07/07 12:10 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 10/4/16 at 1:30 PM. fact end is extended to 12/30/16. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/7/16. (tjg, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 07/07 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/7/2016. (tjg, ) |
||
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order
Fri 05/06 1:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Thursday, July 7, 2016 at 11:30 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/6/16. (tjg, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 05/06 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/6/2016. (tjg, ) |
||
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Fri 03/04 1:12 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW028862 RE: Jessica L. Foscolo. (sr, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Fri 03/04 1:14 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JESSICA L. FOSCOLO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
qc
QC - Pro Hac Vice request
Tue 03/01 9:52 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by J. Kavesh on 2/29/16 cannot be processed until pro hac application fee has been paid. Counsel is advised that once the fee has been recorded Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel will be noted. This message is for informational purposes only. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 02/29 12:53 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jessica L. Foscolo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/23 2:59 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a Telephone Conference for 5/6/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor, any motion to amend pleadings must be filed by 8/28/2016, Fact Discovery shall remain open through 8/28/2016, any motion to add new parties, whether by amended or third-party complaint, must be filed by 8/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/23/16; etc(sr, ) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 02/23 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/23/2016. (tjg, ) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 02/23 7:41 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER permitting Jessica L. Foscolo to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/22/16. (sr, ) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit
Fri 02/19 12:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Jessica L. Foscolo in Support of Her Application for Pro Hac Vice by DDR CORP..(KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing for U.S. District Courts, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Joseph S. Kavesh in Support of DDR's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica L. Foscolo, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Wed 12/30 1:19 PM
ORDER adjourning the 1/4/16 conference to 2/23/16. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan by 2/19/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/30/15. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 11/18 3:51 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in the sum of $135,414.92 in favor of Plaintiff, COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY against Defendant, CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC.. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 11/18/15. (sr, ) |
|
29 | 29
19
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 11/18 3:46 PM
OPINION fld. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 11/18/15. (sr, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Tue 10/13 3:53 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/05 5:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by DDR CORP. re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2008 to 2009 Colony policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2009 to 2011 Colony policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Mark Wyse Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Colony Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Colony's Request for Default, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Colony ROR 1.28.15 letter, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit KLSN 2.23.15 letter to court, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Colony ROR 3.4.15 letter, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Motion to Intervene Order and Opinion, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit DDR Answer with Counterclaim, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Colony Reply to DDR counterclaim, | ||
Att: 13 Affidavit Affidavit of Eric C. Cotton, | ||
Att: 14 Brief DDR Memo of Law in Opposition | ||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 09/25 2:40 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Tue 09/08 10:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 1/4/16 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/8/15. (tjg, ) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 09/04 2:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY by DDR CORP..(KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 09/02 1:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the deadline for DDR to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/4/15, return date of Colony's Motion for Default Judgment as against Control Building is extended to 10/19/15, deadline to file any opposition papers to Colony's Motion for Default Judgment as against Control Building is extended to 10/5/15, and the deadline to file any reply papers in further support of Colony's Motion for Default Judgment as against Control Building is extended to October 13, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 9/2/15. (sr, ) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/31 4:02 PM
STIPULATION and Order Adjourning DDR'S Time to Respond To The Complaint and Colony's Motion for Default Judgment Against Control Building by DDR CORP.. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Tue 08/11 3:08 PM
ORDER granting9 MOTION to Intervene by DDR CORP. The Clerk is directed to amend the caption to include DDR Corp. (f/k/a Developers Diversified Realty Corporation) as a defendant; DDR shall respond to the complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 8/11/15. (DD, ) |
|
20 | 20
8
pgs
order
Opinion
Tue 08/11 3:03 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 8/11/15. (DD, ) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/10 2:00 PM
STIPULATION and Order Adjourning DDR Corp.'s Motion to Intervene by DDR CORP.. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 08/03 4:55 PM
Exhibit to17 Brief by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
17 | 17
respoth
Brief
Mon 08/03 4:48 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DDR'S MOTION TO INTERVENE (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 06/11 4:01 PM
ORDER adjourning7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. filed by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY to 9/8/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/11/15. (sr, ) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/01 10:01 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. . Motion set for 6/15/2015 before Judge William H. Walls. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, ) |
||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 06/01 10:00 AM
SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER adjourning DDR's Motion to Intervene until 8/17/15; etc. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 5/29/15. (sr, ) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/28 4:14 PM
STIPULATION re9 MOTION to Intervene SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJOURNING DDR CORP.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 04/21 12:09 PM
TEXT ORDER ---- The parties' request for extended deadlines regarding DDR Corp's motion to intervene, ECF # 9, is granted. The new deadlines are set forth in the parties stipulation, ECF #12 So Ordered by Judge William H. Walls on 4/21/2015. (emc) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/15 3:49 PM
STIPULATION re9 MOTION to Intervene STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJORNING DDR CORP.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 04/01 10:03 AM
TEXT ORDER Please disregard the Court's Order regarding the deadline for filing the motion to intervene, ECF No. 10. It is moot in light of DDR's motion, ECF No. 9. So Ordered by Judge William H. Walls on 4/1/15. (sr, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 03/31 1:41 PM
ORDER that any motion to intervene shall be filed by 4/30/15. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 3/31/15. (sr, ) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Intervene
Mon 03/30 2:45 PM
MOTION to Intervene by DDR CORP..(KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of DDR's Motion to Intervene, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Mon 03/30 3:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTE RE: document #7 - Motion to Intervene - Chambers will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Mon 02/23 11:55 AM
Letter.(KAVESH, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Statement Ltr from Colony dated January 28, 2015 | ||
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Tue 01/13 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTE RE: document #7 Motion for Default Judgment - Chambers will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, January 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 01/12 2:42 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 2/3/2015(BRIGANTI, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Regina L. Tuggle, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Request for Default by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY against CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC..(BRIGANTI, PAUL) | |
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Paul A. Briganti | ||
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Control Building Services, Inc. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sr, ) | ||
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. served on 9/25/2014, answer due 10/16/2014. (BRIGANTI, PAUL) | |
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL ANTHONY BRIGANTI on behalf of COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BRIGANTI, PAUL) | |
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *ANGELICA RICHARDSON* (anr) | |
Thursday, September 11, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying ARGO GROUP INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, LTD. as Corporate Parent. (anr) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against CONTROL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5923245) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COLONY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(anr) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |