Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:22-bk-10654
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Oct 24, 2022
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022

Debtor
MBN Transport Services, LLC
6724 S. Paxton Ave., #2S
Chicago, IL 60649
Represented By
David M Siegel
David M. Siegel & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Miriam R. Stein
Gutnicki LLP 4711 Golf Road Suite 200
Skokie, IL 60076
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 09/19/2022 12:02 AM CDT
Sunday, September 18, 2022
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Sun 09/18 12:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by David M Siegel on behalf of MBN Transport Services, LLC (Siegel, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signature Pages
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Sun 09/18 1:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/24/2022 at 12:00 PM at Appear By VIDEO. See details at www.justice.gov/ust/file/ILN.pdf/download.. (Auto Assign, Admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Sun 09/18 1:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-10654 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45204559. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Siegel, David) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1