Carter v. CIOX Health, LLC
Original Case: 6:14-cv-06275
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02036 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
COIX Health, LLC f/k/a HealthPort Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Rochester General Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Unity Hospital of Rochester
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
F.F. Thompson Hospital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CIOX Health, LLC f/k/a HealthPort Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marissa Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Evelyn Grys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bruce Currier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sharon Koning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sue Beehler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marsha Mancuso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brad S. Tiefel, as Administrator of the Estate of Jaclyn Cuthbertson, as individuals and as representatives of the classes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/30/2024 3:57 AM EST |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sue Beehler, Marissa Carter, Bruce Currier, Evelyn Grys, Sharon Koning, Marsha Mancuso and Brad S. Tiefel, FILED. [3384512] 22-2036 [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 23 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Sue Beehler, Marissa Carter, Bruce Currier, Evelyn Grys, Sharon Koning, Marsha Mancuso and Brad S. Tiefel, district court receipt # ANYWDC-4676861, FILED.[3384517] 22-2036 [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:20 PM] | |
3 | 3 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/18/2022, RECEIVED.[3384518] 22-2036 [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:21 PM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/19/2022, RECEIVED.[3384520] 22-2036 [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:21 PM] |