Aponte v. 5th Ave. Kings Fruit & Vegetables Corp.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-05625
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02047 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 23, 2022 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
20/20 Grocery and Deli Corp.
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
5th Ave. Kings Fruit & Vegetables Corp., DBA 5th Ave. Kings Supermarket
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Adel Kassim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Leonardo Aponte
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/23/2022 3:28 AM EST |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant 5th Ave. Kings Fruit & Vegetables Corp. and Adel Kassim, FILED. [3385288] 22-2047 [Entered: 09/20/2022 12:57 PM] | |
Att: 1 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3385298] 22-2047 [Entered: 09/20/2022 01:02 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3385301] 22-2047 [Entered: 09/20/2022 01:03 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant 5th Ave. Kings Fruit & Vegetables Corp. and Adel Kassim, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15952498, FILED.[3385312] 22-2047 [Entered: 09/20/2022 01:09 PM] |