Brown v. Building Engines, Inc.
Original Case: 1:21-cv-10893
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02053 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2023 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Building Engines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael Brown, as agent on behalf of former equityholders of Emergent Properties Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/19/2023 4:28 AM EDT |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Brown, FILED. [3385947] 22-2053 [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:25 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/11/2022, RECEIVED.[3385951] 22-2053 [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:28 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Brown, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26663913, FILED.[3385956] 22-2053 [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:29 AM] |