Y.S. v. New York City Department of Education
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00711
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02068 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 13, 2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
New York City Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Y.S., individually and on behalf of Y.F. and S.F., children with disabilities
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 4:28 AM EDT |
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant New York City Department of Education in 22-2068 FILED. [3387199] 22-2068 22-1914 [Entered: 09/22/2022 05:35 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 29 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/19/2022, RECEIVED.[3387202] 22-2068 [Entered: 09/22/2022 05:38 PM] | |
3 | 3 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/22/2022, RECEIVED.[3387203] 22-2068 [Entered: 09/22/2022 05:39 PM] | |
4 | 4 NOTE: See lead case, 22-1914 containing complete set of docket entries.[3387204] 22-2068 [Entered: 09/22/2022 05:40 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3387205] 22-2068 [Entered: 09/22/2022 05:40 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |