Kasiotis v. New York Black Car Operators' Injury Compensation
Original Case: 7:18-cv-08057
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02061 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2024 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
New York Black Car Operators' Injury Compensation Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joseph Kasiotis, individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated New York comsumers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/03/2024 3:23 AM EST |
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Petitioner New York Black Car Operators' Injury Compensation Fund, Inc., FILED. [3386685] 22-2061 [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:10 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case FILED | ||
Att: 3 16 pgs Supporting Document | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3386693] 22-2061 [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:16 AM] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3387233] 22-2061 [Entered: 09/23/2022 06:40 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |