North America Photon Infotech Ltd. v. ZoomInfo LLC
Original Case: 1:20-cv-02180
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02074 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
ZoomInfo LLC, FKA Discoverorg, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
North America Photon Infotech Ltd., a Mauritius private limited company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/26/2022 4:20 AM EDT |
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant ZoomInfo LLC in 22-2074 FILED. [3387383] 22-2074 22-1979 [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:28 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs SEALED DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/09/2022, RECEIVED.[3387388] 22-2074 [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:31 AM] | |
3 | 3 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, dated 08/09/2022, RECEIVED.[3387391] 22-2074 [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:32 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant ZoomInfo LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26715554, FILED.[3387393] 22-2074 [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:33 AM] |